Fisher v. Bryant et al
Plaintiff: |
Jeffery L Fisher |
Defendant: |
Bryant, Young, George, Louderback and County of Butte |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv02311 |
Filed: |
August 27, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 9, 2012 |
Filing
30
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/08/12 recommending that defendants 02/24/12 motion for summary judgment 25 be granted; and this action be dismissed. Motion for Summary Judgment 25 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/2/12 ORDERING that, within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment/ motion for summary adjudication and shall SHOW CAUSE in writing w hy sanctions should not be imposed for the failure to file a timely opposition. In the alternative, if petitioner no longer wishes to proceed with this matter, he shall file a request to dismiss this action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 29, 2011 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/28/11 GRANTING 22 Motion for reimbursement of the filing fee. The Financial Department of the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California is directed to reimburse plaintiff in the amount of $350.00.(Dillon, M)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2011 ORDERING that w/in 21 days, pltf shall file a notice of change of address, provide his patient or inmate identification number, and inform the court of his current status at the facility. (Yin, K)
|
April 7, 2011 |
Filing
12
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/6/11 ORDERING the Sheriff of Butte County to collect an initial partial filing fee of $5.06 and thereafter, forward payment from theprison trust account of Jeffrey Le e Fisher to the clerk until the balance of $344.94 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Butte County. The clerk isdirected to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial )(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?