Jones v. Ballesteros et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Jones
Defendant: Ballesteros, Lee and Chopplin
Case Number: 2:2010cv02661
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/25/16 ORDERING for the above-stated reasons, Plaintiff's 105 motion is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHENTICATING EXHIBITS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/25/16. (Becknal, R)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/16/16. The original writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum 113 is hereby vacated. ordering the Custodian to produce Jeremy Jones on 9 /12/16 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new Custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(3 certified copies sent to the Warden, California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility and State Prison, Corcoran)(Plummer, M)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/5/2016 DENYING 95 Motion for Attorney Call because all requests for court action by or on behalf of the plaintiff must be filed by his counsel. (Michel, G.)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FURTHER PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/25/16: Jury Trial set for 9/12/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Plaintiff shall file any necessary applications for writs of habeas corpus ad testificandum no later than 8/12/16. Any motions in limine shall be filed no later than 8/26/16. (Kaminski, H)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/9/16. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/02/16 ORDERING that attorneys Edward P. Sangster and Peter Edward Soskin have been selected from the court's pro bono attorney panel to represent plaintiff and have agreed to be appointed for plaintiff Jeremy Jones. (Benson, A)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/28/15 ORDERING that the court has determined that plaintiff's claims and the status of the case warrantappointment of counsel. This case is REFERRED to the courts ADR and Pro Bono Coordinator, Suje an Park, for identification of counsel to represent plaintiff at the status conference set below and at trial. The trial confirmation hearing previously set for January 29, 2016, is VACATED, and a status conference is SET for February 4, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. before the undersigned. The request for a telephonic appearance, ECF No. 93 , is DENIED as MOOT.(Dillon, M)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 70 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/14/14. (Plummer, M)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/14/13 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve a pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial. Defendant shall file a pretrial statement not later than thirty days after the filing of plaintiffs statement. Pretrial conference (as described in Local Rule 282) will be conducted on the file only, without appearance by either party. The date for jury trial before a district judge will be set in the pretrial order. (Dillon, M)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/2/2013 ORDERING the parties to this action to submit, no later than 30 days, confidential statements as described in this order. (cc: ADR)(Yin, K)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/25/13 ADOPTING IN FULL 61 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Meuleman, A)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/27/13 ORDERING that the courts May 20, 2013 findings and recommendations (ECF No. 49 ) are VACATED; and plaintiffs August 12, 2013 surreply (ECF No. 59 ) is stricken. It is further RECOMMENDED that defendant Choplins November 30, 2012 motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 38 ) be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/3/13 GRANTING 51 Motion for Extension and the May 20, 2013 findings and recommendations are held in abeyance, to the extent that plaintiff has 30 days to file his opposition to defendants November 30, 2012 motion for summary judgment.(Dillon, M)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/20/13 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/20/13 ordering plaintiff's motion to compel and request for extension of time 45 is denied. Within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve a response to the motion for summary judgment or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court's scheduling orders and the Local Rules. (Plummer, M)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/18/13 ADOPTING in full 35 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 39 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendant Lee is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. (Meuleman, A)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/24/12 denying 31 Motion to Compel. The clerk is directed to randomly assign a United States District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant Lee be dismissed from this action without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/24/12 ordering plaintiff's filing 27 is disregarded and the clerk of the court shall make a notation on the docket to that effect. (Plummer, M)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/18/12 ORDERING the Clerk to mail plaintiff one form USM-285. Within 60 days, plaintiff may submit the attached Notice of Submission of Documents with a completed form USM-285 providing instructions forservice of process upon defendant Lee. (Benson, A.)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/13/11 ORDERING the court hereby orders that the amended complaint is dismissed with leave to amend within 30 days. (Becknal, R)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/7/11ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Jeremy Jones to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid i n full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ballesteros et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballesteros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?