Tandel v. County of Sacramento, et al
Plaintiff: Sandipkumar Tandel
Defendant: County of Sacramento, John McGinness, Ann Marie Boylan, Asa Hambly, Kroner, Feliciano, James Austin, Bauer, Sokolov, Garvey, Sotak, Ko, Sahba and Wilson
Case Number: 2:2011cv00353
Filed: February 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/16/2017 ORDERING this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. CASE CLOSED(Washington, S)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/9/2017 ORDERING the deadline to file dispositional documents shall be EXTENDED to 5/10/2017.(Washington, S)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/5/2017 ORDERING the deadline by which the parties shall file dispositional documents shall be CONTINUED to 5/3/2017. (Washington, S)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/2/2017 ORDERING that the deadline to file dispositional documents shall be EXTENDED to 4/3/2017. (Jackson, T)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/07/2016 ORDERING that the deadline to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED to 2/2/2017. (Jackson, T)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/24/16 ORDERING that the deadline to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED to 11/02/16; no sanctions are ordered. (Benson, A)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/12/2016 ORDERING the deadline for the parties to file dispositional documents is hereby EXTENDED to 8/2/2016. (Reader, L)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/17/2016 CONTINUING the Settlement Conference to 2/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Michel, G.)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/7/15 ORDERING that the deadline for filing the Trial Brief and objections to Defendants' Motions in Limine is EXTENDED to 12/7/2015. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/18/15 ORDERING that Jury Trial is COTNINUED from 9/8/15 to 2/26/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The parties shall file trial briefs not later t han 12/3/15. The Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED from 7/30/15 to 12/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due not later than 11/19/15. Any Evidentiary or procedural Motions are to be filed by 11/19/2015. Oppositions must be filed by 12/3/15 and any reply must be filed by 12/10/15. The Motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 06/16/15 ORDERING that dates are EXTENDED as follows: Joint Final Pretrial Statement and Procedural and Evidentiary Motions due 07/09/15; Trial Briefs and Oppositions due 07/16/15; Replies due 07/23/15. (Benson, A)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/20/15 ORDERING Based on the foregoing, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 135 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: Defendants' request for summary adjudication as to First Claim for Relief, is GRANTED as to Defendant Anne Marie Boylan, but DENIED as to Defendant John McGinness; Defendants' request for summary adjudication as to the Second Claim for Relief is GRANTED as to Defendants Ba uer, Sabha, Sotok, Kroner, Felicano, Boylan and Iwasa, but DENIED as to Defendants Jacoby and Medeiros; Defendant County's request for summary adjudication as to the Third, Fifth and Ninth Claims for Relief is DENIED; Defendant County's request for summary adjudication as to the Fourth and Seventh Claims for Relief is GRANTED; Given Plaintiff's consent, Defendant County's request for summary adjudication as to the Eighth Claim for Relief is GRANTED; Given Plaintiff&# 039;s consent, Defendants County of Sacramento, Sotok, Bauer and Sahba are dismissed as Defendants from the Tenth and Eleventh Claims for Relief; Because Plaintiff has failed to oppose Defendants' request that the Tenth and Eleventh Claims for Relief, to the extent they continue to be alleged against any other defendant, be dismissed in their entirety, summary adjudication as to the Tenth and Eleventh Claims is GRANTED; and Given Plaintiff's consent, Defendant John Wilson is dismissed from this action. (Becknal, R)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/3/15 ORDERING that Dr. Smiths 136 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Dr. Smith is DISMISSED from this action. (Kastilahn, A)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/10/14 ORDERING the Jury Trial RESET for 8/31/15 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7; The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 6/25/15; Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 7/9/15 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7; The Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due not later than 6/18/15; Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 6/18/15; Oppositions must be filed by 6/25/15 and any reply must be filed by 7/2/1 5; The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference; Due to the Court's high civil caseload, the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to a jury or nonjury trial before the assigned Magistrate Judge as well as availing themselves of the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution programs. (Becknal, R)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/3/2014 DISMISSING claims eight, ten, and eleven and Defendant Wilson with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(2) re 152 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Michel, G)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/24/2014 ORDERING that the 111 pretrial scheduling order is modified as follows: The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be 9/4/2014. Opposition and any cross-motion filed at least 7 weeks prior to hearing. Reply and opposition to cross-motion filed at least 3 weeks prior to hearing. Reply to cross-motion filed at least 1 week prior to hearing. (Zignago, K.)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/3/2014 GRANTING defendants' 132 Application to Exceed Page Limit. The supporting Points and Authorities for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment may be up to 40 pages in length. Plaintiff's Opposition is subject to the same 40 page limitation.Defendants' Reply, should they choose to file one, may not exceed 20 pages. (Marciel, M)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Initial and Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Deadline for Expert Witness Depositions signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/22/14 re: 124 . (Meuleman, A)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Defendants Austin, Iwasa, Jacoby, Medeiros, and Jordan's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/16/14. (Kastilahn, A)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/13/2014 ORDERING that the 111 Pretrial Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Non-Expert discovery shall be completed by 3/5/2014. All other existing pre-trial dates remain in effect. (Zignago, K.)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/7/14. (Kaminski, H)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/26/13 ORDERING that Defendant JAMES AUSTIN is DISMISSED with prejudice from Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief for Violation of the Eighth and Fourteenth Amendments to the Constitution for Failure to Provide Appropriate Medical Care. Defendant MARK IWASA is DISMISSED with prejudice from Plaintiff's Tenth Claim for Relief for Negligence. Defendant SHELLEY JORDAN is DISMISSED with prejudice from Plaintiff's Tenth Claim for Relief for Negligence. All parties to bear his/her/its/their own attorney's fees and costs. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/19/12 DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE Hank Carl (RN). Each side is to bear his, her, or their own attorney's fees and costs. (Meuleman, A)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/20/12 ORDERING that the County Defendants' 94 request for an extension of time, up to and including 9/25/2012, to file and serve an Answer to Plaintiff's Consolidated Second Amended Complaint, is GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/21/12 County ORDERING Defendants' and Defendant Sokolov's motions are granted in part and denied in part, consistent with the foregoing, as follows: 1. With respect to County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 80 : a) Plaintiff's First Claim under § 1983 for failure to provide adequate medical care is GRANTED as to Hambly, Carl, Gaddis and Keillor; b) Plaintiff's Sixth Claim under § 1983 for retaliat ion for protesting is GRANTED as to Bauer, Boylan and McGinness; c) Plaintiff's Tenth Claim for negligence is GRANTED as to McGinness, Boylan, Wilson, and Austin, and is DENIED as to Felicano, Sahba, Sotak, Bauer and Kroner; d) Plaintiff's Eleventh Claim for medical negligence is DENIED as to Sotak, Bauer and Sahba; e) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's newly named Doe Defendants is DENIED; 2. With respect to Defendant Sokolov's Motion to Dismiss 76 : a) Plaintif f's Second Claim under § 1983 for failure to provide adequate medical care is GRANTED as to Sokolov; b) Plaintiff's Tenth Claim for negligence is GRANTED as to Sokolov; c) Plaintiff's Eleventh Claim for medical negligence is GRANT ED as to Sokolov; 3. Sokolov's Motion for a More Definitive Statement 76 is deemed as moot because his Motion to Dismiss was granted; County Defendants' Motion to Strike 81 is DENIED. Because Plaintiff has already been accorded leave to amend, and since his attempts to plead cognizable claims against the various defendants remain unavailing as set forth above, no further leave to amend will be permitted as to the claims dismissed herein. (Becknal, R)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/18/12 DISMISSING Keelin Garvey with prejudice. (Manzer, C)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/22/2012 ORDERING 44 County Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED in PART and GRANTED in PART. (Reader, L)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/17/12 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 42 Motion to Dismiss, 44 Motion to Dismiss, and 45 Motion to Dismiss in accordance with this Order. (Meuleman, A)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/5/2011 re 47 ORDERING that the parties that the current deadline of August 8, 2011 to file a Joint Status Report be EXTENDED to October 7, 2011 to allow for the resolution of the pending motions to dismiss.(Duong, D)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the First Amended Complaint 36 is GRANTED.Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint Naming Doe Defendants in Case No. 2:09-CV-842, within twenty (20) days of this Order being electronically filed. The hearing, scheduled for 6/23/11 before this Court, is hereby VACATED. (Becknal, R)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/3/2011 GRANTING 9 Defendants Motion to Consolidate Cases with 2:09-CV-842 MCE GGH; All pending dates in both actions are hereby VACATED; The parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report in accordance with the requirements outlined within the Court's 3/31/2011 Order Requiring Joint Status Report in Case No. 2:11-CV-353-MCE-GGH.(Reader, L)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/31/11 ORDERING this case RELATED to 2:09-cv-842 MCE GGH; the action denominated 2:11-cv- 00353-JAM-JFM, Sandipkumar Tandel v. County of Sacramento, et al. is REASSIGNED to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only is hereby VACATED; the Clerk of the Court is to issue an Order Requiring Joint Status Report; henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:11-cv-00353-MCE-GGH. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tandel v. County of Sacramento, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Jennifer Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hambly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feliciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sokolov
Represented By: Robert Frederick Tyler, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garvey
Represented By: Robert Frederick Tyler, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandipkumar Tandel
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?