Sharifi v. Schneider National Trucking Company et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Sharifi
Defendant: Schneider National Trucking Company, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. and Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv01517
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/2/15 ORDERING the above-captioned matter is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs in connection with this action. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/23/2014. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2014 is VACATED and CONTINUED to 4/27/2015 at 9:00 AM. Parties shall file Trial Briefs no later than 2/19/2015. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2014 is also VACATED and RE-SET for 3/5/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due by 2/12/2015. Any Evidentiary or Procedural Motions shall be filed by 2/12/2015. Oppositions must be filed by 2/19/2015 and Replies must be filed by 2/26/2015. Motions will be heard at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. (Marciel, M)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER 52 signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/7/14 ORDERING that the June 16, 2014 Jury Trial, the April 17, 2014 Final Pretrial Conference, and the February 6, 2014 Order Continuing Trial, ECF No. 51 , are all VACATED. The Court will reset trial by separate order. (Kastilahn, A)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/5/2014 ORDERING that the Jury trial is VACATED and CONTINUED to 6/16/2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7. The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 4/3/2014. The 3/20/ 2014 Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and CONTINUED to 4/17/2014, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. The Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due not later than 3/27/2014. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 3/27/2014. Oppositions must be filed by 4/3/2014 and any reply must be filed by 4/10/2014. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. (Zignago, K.)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/6/14 ORDERING that the Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 5/12/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. The parties shall file trial brief s not later than 3/6/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 3/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Any evidentiary or procedural motions currently set for hearing on January 23, 2014 will be considered at the March 20, 2014 Final Pretrial Conference. (Kastilahn, A)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/19/2013 ORDERING 14 that defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; and DENYING 15 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Reader, L) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Reader, L).
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED 16 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/7/2013 GRANTING defendants' 13 Ex Parte Application to continue hearing on dispositive motions. The 2/21/2013 14 15 Motions for Summary JudgmentHearing is RE-SCHEDULED for 5/30/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). Opposition, if any to these Motions, shall be filed in writing and served not less than 14 days preceding the Hearing date. Replies, if any, shall be filed in writing and served not less than 7 days. Pursuant to the Court's 8 Pretrial Scheduling Order, the last day to file any new or amended Disposition Motion(s) is 1/24/2013. All other due dates set forth in Scheduling Order are CONFIRMED. (Marciel, M)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/3/2013 GRANTING 13 Ex Parte Application to continue the last date for hearing of dispositive motions. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Court will hear dispositive motions on 5/30/2013. All dates for submission of papers shall comply with Local Rule 230. Opposition, if any, shall be filed in writing and served not less than fourteen (14) days preceding the hearing date. (Zignago, K.)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/29/2012 ORDERING Jury Trial Reset for 3/17/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Trial Briefs due by 1/9/2014; Final Pretrial Conference Reset for 1/23/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Joint Pretrial Statement 1/2/2014; Evidentiary or Procedural Motions due by 1/2/2014, Oppositions due by 1/9/2014, any replies due by 1/16/2014. (Reader, L)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/7/11: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/10/2012. Discovery due by 8/10/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/21/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial set for 6/10/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharifi v. Schneider National Trucking Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Sharifi
Represented By: Adam Blair Corren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Trucking Company
Represented By: Kurt A. Kappes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt A. Kappes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt A. Kappes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?