August 27, 2018 |
Filing
82
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/24/2018 ADOPTING 78 Parties' Stipulation and DEEMING 79 - 80 Replies as timely filed and RECOMMENDING 62 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted in part , as detailed in this Order and Findings and Recommendations; summary judgment be entered sua sponte on Plaintiff's retaliation claim against Nurse Cox; and this action be closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
March 14, 2018 |
Filing
71
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/13/2018 VACATING the 3/6/2018 Order to Show Cause and DENYING as unnecessary, plaintiff's 69 motion for an order shortening time. Within 7 days, counsel for plaintiff shall: (a) confer with defendants' counsel to determine whether defendants are willing to stipulate to a third extension of time; (b) file either a stipulation for such extension or a motion for an extension of time.(Yin, K)
|
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
70
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/05/18 ORDERING within 20 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to file an opposition to the summary judgment motion. (Plummer, M)
|
January 25, 2018 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/25/2018 ORDERING pursuant to the parties stipulation plaintiff's opposition to the motion for summary judgment is due on or before 1/26/2018; and defendants' reply is due on or before 2/2/2018.(Yin, K)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/14/17, DENYING the parties' 58 joint stipulation. (Kastilahn, A)
|
April 4, 2017 |
Filing
55
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 04/03/17 ordering Kimberly A. Harrison is appointed as counsel in the above entitled matter for the limited purpose of completing discovery and filing or opposing dispositive motions, if any. Kimber ly A. Harrisons appointment will terminate when the order ruling on any dispositive motions has been filed, or upon the expiration of time to file any dispositive motions, if none have been filed. Prior to the termination of the appointment, the cour t will accord counsel the option of proceeding as plaintiffs appointed counsel through trial. If counsel does not wish to continue representation of plaintiff after she has carried out her limited purpose appointment, the court will consider appointing new counsel for plaintiff, if deemed appropriate at that time. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Kimberly Harrison, Law Office of Kimberly A. Harrison, 101 G St., Suite 100, Sacramento, CA 95814.(Plummer, M)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/14/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for the appointment of counsel (ECF No. 46 ) is granted. Alternative Dispute Resolution and Pro Bono Program Director Sujean Park is directed to locate an att orney, admitted to practice in this court, who is willing to accept this appointment and represent plaintiff for the purposes of trial. Defendants Motion for Terminating Sanctions and Alternate Motion to Compel and for Monetary Sanctions (ECF No. [42 ]) is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: Defendants motion for an order compelling plaintiff to participate in a deposition is granted; Defendants motion to compel interrogatory responses is denied; Defendants motion for terminating sanctions is denied; and Defendants motion for monetary sanctions is denied. (cc ADRP)(Dillon, M)
|
August 14, 2015 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/14/15 ordering that plaintiff's motion for a stay of proceedings 46 is denied as moot. (Plummer, M)
|
July 14, 2014 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/11/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 40 motion for appointment of counsel, without prejudice. (Yin, K)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/11/14 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 1/6/14 31 are ADOPTED in full; The MOTION to DISMISS filed on 7/19/14 20 on behalf of defendants Nangalama, Dillan, Sahota, Cox, Teachow and Deem is GRANTED in part as follows: Plaintiff's claims against all defendants sued in their official capacities are DISMISSED; Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claim is DISMISSED; and This action shall proceed against defendants in their individual capacities solely as to Plaintiff's claim that he was provided constitutionally inadequate medical care in violation of his rights under the Eighth Amendment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
32
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/6/2014 ORDERING 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are ADOPTED in full; Defendant Fields is DISMISSED from this action; This action shall proceed with defendants Nangalama, Dillan, Sahota, Cox, TEachow and Deem. (Waggoner, D)
|
January 6, 2014 |
Filing
31
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/3/2014 DIRECTING the Clerk to change defendant "Sabota" to defendant "Sahota", and change defendant "Deen" to defendant "Deem&q uot; on the court's docket; and RECOMMENDING that defendants' 20 motion to dismiss be granted, in part as to (a) plaintiff's claims against all defendants sued in their official capacities should be dismissed, (b) plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claim be dismissed; and this action shall proceed against defendants in their individual capacities solely as to plaintiff's claim that he was provided constitutionally inadequate medical care in violation of his rights under the Eighth Amendment. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
December 5, 2013 |
Filing
30
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/4/2013 RECOMMENDING that defendant Fields be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
September 10, 2013 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/9/2013 ORDERING that, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the defendants' 7/19/2013 motion to dismiss. (Yin, K)
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/19/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs August 5, 2013 filing styled as a Show of Good Cause (ECF No. 23 ) is DENIED; On or before October 8, 2013, plaintiff shall submit his Notice of Submission and the documents set forth in the courts July 8, 2013 order; and plaintiff's failure to submit the required documents for service on defendant Fields will result in the dismissal of defendant Fields from this action.(Dillon, M)
|
July 8, 2013 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/08/13 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, along with an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint file 04/25/12. The plaintiff shall return the attached Notice of submission of documents, the completed USM-285 from for defendant Fields and 2 copies of the 04/25/12 complaint within 60 days. (Plummer, M)
|
March 21, 2013 |
Filing
11
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Patrick Bumpus signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/20/2013. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
|
August 2, 2012 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/1/2012, VACATING the 5 findings and recommendations; plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, an application to proceed ifp and a certified trust account statement; the Clerk to provide plaintiff with an ifp application; and plaintiff's failure to comply shall result in the dismissal of this action. (Yin, K)
|
June 26, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/25/2012 ORDERING that this action be randomly assigned to a District Judge; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/12 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, either the $350.00 filing fee or a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner for use in a civil rights action.(Dillon, M)
|