Segura v. McDonald, et al
Plaintiff: |
Jose Luis Segura |
Defendant: |
Michael McDonald and Matthew Cate |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00393 |
Filed: |
February 27, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 3, 2015 |
Filing
50
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/03/15 ORDERING plaintiff's motion to accept his objections and motion to compel 48 at 1 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to compel 48 at 4 is denied. Defendants' motion to file documents under seal 41 is denied as moot. The clerk of the court is directed to randomly assign a United States District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this actio n. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 39 be granted on the grounds that plaintiff's failed to exhaust administrative remedies. Plaintiff's second amended complaint 32 be dismissed without prejudice. Motions 32 and 39 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 16, 2015 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/15/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 43 motion for the appointment of counsel; GRANTING plaintiff's 42 motion for an extension of time ; and plaintiff shall file and serve his opposition on or before 7/29/2015. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be filed within 7 days thereafter. (Yin, K)
|
December 30, 2014 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/29/14 ORDERING that 37 Motion to take deposition by videoconference is GRANTED.(Dillon, M)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/24/14 granting 33 Motion for the second amended complaint to be screened. Defendants McDonald and Villanueva, against whom plaintiff makes colorable claims of a failure to protect in the second amended complaint and who have been previously served, have 30 days to file a response to the second amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing
26
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/25/14 ordering the court will order plaintiff to show cause within 30 days why his first amended complaint should not be dismissed as defective based on 1) plaintiff's own repr esentation that he may have named the wrong defendants, and 2) failure of the first amended complaint to comply with Rule 11(a). Should plaintiff elect to proceed on the first amended complaint, he must inform the court within 30 days that the first amended complaint names the appropriate defendants and he must submit a properly signed copy of his first amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/15/14 ORDERING that 21 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within thirty days from the date of service of this order; and Plaintiffs second amended complaint must be signed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a) and L.R. 131(b).(Dillon, M)
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
6
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/21/13 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Jose Luis Segura to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
|
March 5, 2013 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/5/2013 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?