Ortiz v. California Deparment of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: |
Josue Ortiz |
Defendant: |
California Deparment of Corrections, St Clair, Jared, Thomatoes, Maldonado, Smith, Martinez, Bangi, Forester, Jeffery Beard, Moris Senegor, Miles and Curtis Allen |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00617 |
Filed: |
March 29, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
27
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/26/2015 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing
24
ORDER denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/13/14: Plaintiff is granted an additional thirty days from the date this Order is signed in which to file a second amended complaint that complies with the August 26, 2014 order. (Kaminski, H)
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/26/2014 DISMISSING plaintiff's amended complaint; plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint ; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff the form for filing a civil rights complaint. (Yin, K)
|
February 28, 2014 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/27/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion 18 is partially granted; and Plaintiff is granted sixty days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/8/2013 VACATING the 11 findings and recommendations; plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days to file an amended complaint; the Clerk shall re-serve a copy of the 9/4/2013 orders on plaintiff; and plaintiff's 12 motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Yin, K)
|
October 21, 2013 |
Filing
11
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/21/2013 DIRECTING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
September 4, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/4/13 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Josue Ortiz to the clerk until the balance of $350 is pa id in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
|
April 9, 2013 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/8/13 DISMISSING without prejudice 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?