Childs v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: E Childs
Defendant: State of California, - Hurley, Jones, Ramirez and CDCR Director
Case Number: 2:2013cv00670
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/31/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 118 request for an extension of time and he has 60 days to file his pretrial statement. Plaintiff's 119 request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for the court to order defendants to provide him with "a full copy of the whole case" (ECF No. 118 at 2) is DENIED. (Yin, K)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying 116 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/01/17. (Plummer, M)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/19/17 ordering within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve a pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial. Defendants shall file a pretrial statement not later than 30 days after the filing of plaintiff's statement. Pretrial conference will be conducted on the file only without appearance by either party. (Plummer, M)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/20/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 1/17/17 104 are ADOPTED in full; and Plaintiff's MOTION for TRO 101 is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/13/17 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Earl Childs on 4/12/17 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 25 befor Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD and KJN) (Plummer, M)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/17/2017 RECOMMENDING plaintiff's 101 motion for a temporary restraining order and/or a preliminary injunction be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER REQUESTING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT STATEMENTS for PRISONER SETTLEMENT PROGRAM signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/30/16. The parties to this action shall each, no later than 30 days from the date of the order, submit confidential statements. (see order for details) (cc ADRP)(Dillon, M)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/22/2016 ADOPTING IN FULL 97 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING Defendants' 78 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Nelson and otherwise DENIED; and DENYING Plaintiff's 93 Motion for Court Intervention. (Jackson, T)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/02/16 recommending that defendants' 10/13/15 motion for summary judgment 78 be granted as plaintiff's claims against defendant Nelson and otherwise denied; and plaintiff's 05/05/16 motion for court intervention 93 be denied. Motions 78 and 93 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/22/16 ordering that defense counsel inquire into plaintiffs allegations, and, within seven days from the date of this order, file a response to plaintiffs motion, including: (1) whether plaint iff is being provided mental health treatment, (2) whether plaintiff has been transferred within the last year or is being considered for transfer, (3) whether plaintiff is being provided timely access to his legal mail and other legal materials, and (4) the cause of the injuries documented in the attachment to plaintiffs motion. (Plummer, M) Modified on 6/22/2016 (Plummer, M).
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/30/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 82 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/14/15 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 5/7/15 76 are ADOPTED in full; and Plaintiff's MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction 73 are DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/07/15 ORDERING plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint 63 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction 73 be denied. MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 73 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days.. (Plummer, M)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/12/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motions to compel discovery (ECF Nos. 56 , 58 ) are DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs request to modify the scheduling order (ECF No. 62) is granted in part and de nied in part. The discovery and scheduling order is modified as follows: a. The parties may conduct discovery until July 13, 2015. Any motions necessary to compel discovery shall be filed by that date. All requests for discovery pursuant to Fed. R . Civ. P. 31, 33, 34, or 36 shall be served not later than April 15, 2015. b. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before October 13, 2015. Motions shall be briefed in accordance with paragraph 8 of the order filed February 21, 2014. c. All other dates identified in the scheduling order (ECF No. 35 ) shall remain in effect. Plaintiffs motion for investigator fees (ECF No. 59 ) is denied. Plaintiffs motion for the appointment of counsel (ECF No. 62 ) is denied.(Dillon, M)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/9/14 ORDERING that the request is granted in part and plaintiffs request for production of documents 43 is deemed timely served on defendants. Defendants shall respond to the request within 30 days. Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A). The Clerk of the Court shall terminate docket numbers 38 and 43 .(Dillon, M)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/19/14. Plaintiff's 18 and 23 Motions for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. (Manzer, C)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/16/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 46 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/13/14 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs motions for a preliminary injunction (ECF Nos. 18 , 23 ) be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/5/14ORDERING that Plaintiff's 6/20/14 REQUESTS 34 are DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/24/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 36 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (Marciel, M)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/25/13 ORDERING that the order dismissing this action 13 is VACATED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to re-open the case. Plaintiffs request for counsel 15 is DENIED. The court will screen the amended complaint 16 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A in due course. (Dillon, M)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/15/13 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim and failure to prosecute. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Earl Childs signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/8/2013. CDCR is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/13/13 ORDERING that plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit therequired trust account statement. Failure to comply with this order will result in this action beingdismissed. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form Application toProceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/15/2013 ORDERING the Clerk to send plaintiff the form complaint and application for leave to proceed ifp; within 30 days, plaintiff shall either pay the $350 filing fee or submit a complet e ifp application; within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit a complaint stating the nature of the action and his belief that he is entitled to redress. Failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childs v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?