Goldsmith v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: James K Goldsmith
Defendant: Smith and Matthew Cate
Case Number: 2:2013cv00943
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/30/14 ORDERING Plaintiff is a former state prisoner proceeding pro se. By order filed June 27, 2014, the undersigned granted defendants' motion to dismiss, and granted plaintiff twenty days to file an amended complaint. Twenty days have now passed, and plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint or otherwise responded. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice. (Becknal, R)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/26/14 GRANTING 18 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is granted 20 days to file an amended complaint. (Manzer, C)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/06/14 ORDERING the clerk of the court is directed to assign a district judge to this case. U.S. District Judge William B. Shubb randomly assigned to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). MOTION to DISMISS 18 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/28/14 ORDERING that the April 10, 2014 hearing on defendants motion to dismiss is vacated; and Within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss.(Dillon, M)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of James K. Goldsmith signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/11/2013. CDCR is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forw ard to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/31/13: This action is dismissed without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/02/13 ordering that within 14 days, plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/20/13 dismissing 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsmith v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James K Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?