Ba v Holder, et al

Plaintiff: Abdoul A Ba
Defendant: Eric Holder, Janet Napolitano and Michael Biggs
Case Number: 2:2013cv01005
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/12/2016 ORDERING that this case remains held in abeyance. The parties shall submit a status report on 6/24/2018. (Zignago, K.)
January 27, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/27/15 re: 17 ORDERING the case to remain held in abeyance. The parties shall submit a status report no later than 4/15/16. (Meuleman, A)
January 29, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/28/2014 ORDERING 15 the case is held in ABEYANCE, the parties shall submit a statusreport on 1/24/2015. CASE STAYED (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ba v Holder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdoul A Ba
Represented By: Clifford C Chigbu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?