Dearwester v. Sacramento County Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Frank Lee Dearwester
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department, Scott Jones, Toliver and Gil
Case Number: 2:2013cv02066
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/18/2016 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to file an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment in compliance with local rules and this court's order. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 6, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Extension of time, 47 Motion for Extension of time and 51 Motion for sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/2/16: Within thirty (30) days of the filed date of this order, plaintiff shall file any response or opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely response to defendants' motion will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Kaminski, H)
September 1, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in full 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/31/15. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 21 is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's Religious Land Use Institutionalized Persons Act claims and DENIED as to Plaintiff's First Amendment claims. Defendants shall file an answer to Plaintiff's First Amendment claims for damages based on their denial of his kosher diet at the Sacramento County Main Jail within 30 days of the date that this Order is electronically filed. (Kastilahn, A)
July 23, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/22/15 RECOMMENDING that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 21) be granted in part and denied in part as follows: a. Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff' ;s RLUIPA claims be granted; b. Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's First Amendment claims be denied; and Defendants be directed to file an answer to plaintiff's First Amendment claims for damages based on their denial of his kosher diet at the Sacramento County Main Jail within 30 days of any order adopting these findings and recommendations. referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
January 6, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/06/15 granting 22 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order in which to file an opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Defendants shall file any reply in accordance with Local Rule 230(l). Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 23 is denied. (Plummer, M)
August 1, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Frank Lee Dearwester signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/31/14. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
October 18, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/17/13 denying 2 Motion to Proceed IFP without prejudice; Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a completed and current affidavit in support of his request t o proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dearwester v. Sacramento County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Lee Dearwester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?