Rodriguez Gama v. Baran, et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rodriguez Gama
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr., Kathy A. Baran, Janet Napolitano, Robert S. Mueller, III and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 2:2013cv02162
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/24/2014 re: 24 Stipulation of Dismissal ORDERING pursuant to this joint stipulation, the matter is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Waggoner, D)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER 22 for continuance signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/22/2014. Status Conference is RE-SCHEDULED for 7/7/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). The Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 6/23/2014. (Marciel, M)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/22/2014 GRANTING without prejudice 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has 21 days from the date this Order is signed to file an amended complaint, if he can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER 8 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/29/2014 resetting the Scheduling Conference for 4/28/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 4/14/2014. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez Gama v. Baran, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mueller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rodriguez Gama
Represented By: Mario Alberto Salgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?