Jenkins v. Lares, et al.

Plaintiff: Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr.
Defendant: Lares, Barker, Young, Parker, Drake, McGrath, Newton, Blauser, Blankenship, C. Nelson, G. Hale, Angulo, Perry, Ron Barnes, J.D. Lozano, R. Gower and Smith
Case Number: 2:2013cv02273
Filed: October 31, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 23 Motion to sever signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/7/17. (Kaminski, H)
August 7, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 08/04/17 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court assign a District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECO MMENDING that defendants's 05/24/17 motion to sever 23 be granted. The claims in case 2:13-cv-2273 be severed in four separate actions, with the current case number remaining assigned to the Claim #1 against defendants Peery, Gower and Barnes . The clerk of court be directed to assign new case numbers for the 3 remaining claims: Claim #2 against defendants Barker and Lares, Claim #3 against defendants McGrath, Parker and Drake, and Claim #4 against defendants Blauser and Smith. The same district judge and magistrate judge be assigned in these new actions; and the filings from case no. 2:13-cv-2273 be included on the dockets of each case. Motion to Sever 23 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 23, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/22/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 3/31/17 Motion to Amend Evidence 20 is DISMISSED; and Plaintiff's 5/1/17 Request for the Appointment of Counsel 21 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 30, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND within 30 days signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/30/15 ORDERING that Defendants Newton, C. Nelson, C. Hale, Lt. Angulo, J.D. Lozano, and Young are DISMISSED from this action without prejudi ce; all claims in the original complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice except for the due process claims against defendants Peery, Gower and Barnes; the retaliation claims against defendants Parker, Drake and McGrath; and the Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Blauser and Smith; the 11 amended complaint is DISMISSED; Clerk to send plaintiff copy of pages 1-10 of 1 original complaint. (Benson, A)
August 13, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/13/14 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr. and forward payment to the court until the bal ance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
November 15, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/15/13 ORDERING that within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission and submit the following documents to the court: a. A complete Ap plication to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and b. A certified copy of plaintiffs prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Lares, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?