May 6, 2020 |
Filing
136
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/5/2020 GRANTING 131 Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Entry of Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H)
|
December 4, 2019 |
Filing
130
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/3/2019 GRANTING 126 Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Settlement and Direction of Notice. Phoenix Class Action Administration Solutions of Orange, California, is APPOINTED as class administrator. The parties are directed to give notice to putative class members. The draft notice of settlement submitted to the Court as Exhibit D to the Declaration of Joseph W. Rose is APPROVED. The final approval hearing is scheduled for Thursday, 4/30/2020, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. (Zignago, K.)
|
January 3, 2019 |
Filing
115
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/30/2018 VACATING 105 Supplemental Scheduling Order. The Parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before 1/29/2019.(Zignago, K.)
|
November 29, 2018 |
Filing
113
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/28/2018 ORDERING the referral to the Court's Voluntary Resolution Program is Postponed; and the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 1/28/2019 regarding the Status of Settlement Discussions. If the matter has not been settled, the Parties will indicate at that time whether they agree to participate in the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program. (Becknal, R)
|
August 30, 2018 |
Filing
111
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/28/18 ORDERING that The matter's referral to the Court's Voluntary Resolution Program is postponed; and The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 11/26/2018, regarding the status of settlement discussions. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
October 6, 2017 |
Filing
103
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/5/17 ORDERING the parties are directed to file a joint status report not later than October 16, 2017. In addition, the Court previously took under submission Plaintiffs' Motion t o Conditionally Certify FLSA Collective Action (ECF No. 79 ) and Leave to Renew Motion (ECF No. 80 ). Given that judgment has since been ordered against Carter Brothers, those Motions are hereby DENIED without prejudice to renewal addressing the changed status of the parties. (Becknal, R)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/14/17 GRANTING Gordon & Rees LLP's 88 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; the Carter Brother's 64 Answer is STRICKEN; and DEFAULT JUDGMENT is entered against Carter Brothers. (Benson, A.)
|
August 31, 2017 |
Filing
101
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/29/17 ORDERING that Carter Brothers shall have until 09/08/17, to seek--through counsel--any modification of the Court's 97 06/27/17 Memorandum and Order. Otherwise, the Court shall proceed as originally set out in that prior decision. (Benson, A.)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
96
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/16/2017 ORDERING the Scheduling Order is amended to vacate the Parties' deadline to meet and confer regarding initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26 (f) and all rel ated deadlines; and Not later than ten (10) days following the date an order is electronically filed resolving Gordon & Rees' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, the parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding the issuance of an Amended Scheduling Order. (Becknal, R)
|
May 4, 2017 |
Filing
89
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/3/17: The June 15, 2017, hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion is VACATED. (Kaminski, H)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing
82
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/12/2017 ORDERING: Within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order the parties shall meet and confer regarding their discovery plan. All discovery, with the exc eption of expert discovery, shall be completed no later than three hundred sixty-five (365) days from the date of this Order. All counsel are to designate in writing and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each ex pert that they propose to tender at trial not later than sixty (60) days after the close of discovery. Supplemental List due within thirty (30) days after the designation of expert witnesses. The parties shall file dispositive motions no later than o ne hundred eighty (180) days after the close of non-expert discovery. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after receiving this Courts ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s). If the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after the close of the designation of supplemental expert witnesses. Any objections to Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order are due within seven (7) days from the date of this Order.(Washington, S)
|
March 20, 2015 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/20/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 54 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED without prejudice to refiling once Carter Brothers' appeal has been adjudicated. (Zignago, K.)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 33 Motion to Change Venue and 34 Motion to Compel signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/29/14. (Kaminski, H)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/29/14 ORDERING that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 32 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|