USA v. Alizadeh et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Abolghassem Alizadeh, Mehran Alizadeh, Suede Blue Inc., Capital City Concepts Inc., Azita Alizadeh, Mike, Mitra Alizadeh, Voyager Restaurant Group Inc., Pegasus Restaurant Group Inc., - Abe, North Valley Food Service LLC, Lake Orta Corporation, Endeavor Restaurant Group Inc., Phoenix Restaurant Group Inc. and Lake Orta Corporation Doing business as Crush #29
Case Number: 2:2014cv00577
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/14/2017. The affected parties have agreed that the claims of the Amended Complaint against Azita Alizadeh may be dismissed with prejudice. ORDERING that the tax claim against Azita Alizadeh in the #4 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. The claim against Azita Alizadeh for injunction is DISMISSED with prejudice. ORDERING that the parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. (Washington, S)
November 13, 2017 Filing 69 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Claims Against Azita Alizadeh by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JUDGMENT dated *11/9/2017* in favor of the United States, against Defendants pursuant to order, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/8/2017 DEFENDANTS are indebted to the United States for unpaid federal trust fund recovery penalties, plus interest according to 28 U.S.C. Sec 1961(c) and 26 U.S.C. Sec 6601, 6621(a)(2), from 6/30/2017, until the judgment is paid. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER OF INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/8/2017 ORDERING that (Abe Alizadeh, Mike Alizadeh, Mitra Alizadeh, Lake Orta Corporation; Phoenix Restaurant Group, Inc.; Suede Blue, Inc.; Pegasus Restaurant Group, Inc.; Voyager Restaurant Group, Inc.; and Endeavor Restaurant Group, Inc.) and any of their officers, employees, representatives, agents, and any other person in active concert or participation with them, are prohibited from doing any of the following, described in this order; Within 30 days of entry of the injunction order, to the extent that data is available, file a complete and accurate employment tax return for any employment tax returns that are due but have not yet been filed; this Court hereby retains jurisdiction over the case to ensure compliance with its injunction and to issue and enforce all other additional decrees and orders as may be necessary and appropriate to the public interest; this injunction will terminate seven years from the date it is entered, or sooner upon the joint application of all parties. (Reader, L)
November 7, 2017 Filing 66 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Judgment and Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment, #2 Stipulation for Injunction, #3 Proposed Injunction, #4 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 09/11/17 ORDERING that the hearing on the #29 Motion for Summary Judgment is RESET for 12/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Benson, A.)
September 11, 2017 Filing 64 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing the Motion Hearing on #29 Motion for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Jennings, Guy)
September 7, 2017 Filing 63 OPPOSITION by Azita Alizadeh to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of Azita Alizadeh, #3 Exhibit A - IRS complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Azita objection to assessment, #5 Exhibit C - Azita objection to assessment, #6 Exhibit D - IRS assessment showing different amounts, #7 Exhibit E - certified Cal Sec St filing June 2010, #8 Exhibit F - certified Cal Sec St filing Nov 2010, #9 Exhibit G - Order deeming RFAs denied, #10 Exhibit H - 2013 Mitra Alizadeh depo pages, #11 Exhibit I - McFarland decl)(Kashani, Mir) Modified on 9/8/2017 (Reader, L).
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DISCOVERY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/22/17. Pursuant to FRCP 36(b), Azita Alizadeh's admissions, if any, to Requests for Admission Nos. 10 and 11, served 9/2/16, are withdrawn, and that instead RFAs 10 and 11, including all subparts, are deemed to have been denied by Azita Alizadeh for all purposes. If Azita fails to give candid responses at her deposition on June 19, Plaintiff may bring a motion to have the RFAs deemed admitted, on whatever legal basis is available.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 21, 2017 Filing 61 STIPULATION and Joint Request for Discovery [PROPOSED] ORDER for Relief from contended admission of RFAs by Azita Alizadeh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kashani, Mir) Modified on 6/22/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/2017 DENYING #58 Ex Part Application to Stay Depositions. (Michel, G.) Modified on 6/16/2017 (Shaddox-Waldrop, A).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/15/2017 ORDERING that defendant Azita Alizadeh's #57 ex parte application is GRANTED. The hearing on the #29 motion for summary judgment is RESET to 9/21/2017 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 2. Defendant Azita Alizadeh's opposition is due fourteen (14) days prior to the new hearing date. Plaintiff's reply is due in accordance with these dates. The Court hereby VACATES the Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2017, and Trial set for 9/11/2017. (Zignago, K.)
June 15, 2017 Filing 58 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Depositions by Abolghassem Alizadeh, Mehran Alizadeh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Malcolm Segal, #2 Proposed Order)(Warner, Paul) Modified on 6/15/2017 (Shaddox-Waldrop, A). Modified on 6/16/2017 (Zignago, K.).
June 13, 2017 Filing 57 THIRD EX PARTE APPLICATION by Azita Alizadeh to Extend Time for Response to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment and Continue of Pretrial and Trial dates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C")(Kashani, Mir) Modified on 6/14/2017 (Zignago, K.).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/2017 ORDERING that the United States' #39 Motion for Discovery Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Zignago, K.)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/18/2017 DENYING #47 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time as moot. (Michel, G.)
May 18, 2017 Filing 54 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman held on 5/18/2017: Court and counsel conferred regarding plaintiff's motion for discovery sanctions #39 . Matter submitted. Order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel G. Patrick Jennings present. Defendants Counsel Paul Warner present. ECRO/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Text Only) (Caspar, M)
May 11, 2017 Filing 53 REPLY by United States of America re #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/10/2017 ORDERING #51 Plaintiffs counsel, G. Patrick Jennings may appear telephonically for the hearing on the discovery motion. Mr. Jennings shall promptly contact the undersigned's courtroom deputy clerk to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance.(Reader, L)
May 9, 2017 Filing 51 REQUEST for TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at 05/18/17 hearing on the #39 Motion for Discovery Sanctions by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
May 8, 2017 Filing 50 OPPOSITION by all defendants to #39 Motion for Discovery Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Warner, Paul)
May 5, 2017 Filing 49 OPPOSITION to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment by all defendants. (Warner, Paul) Modified on 5/8/2017 (Benson, A).
May 5, 2017 Filing 48 OPPOSITION to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment by Mitra Alizadeh. (Warner, Paul) Modified on 5/8/2017 (Benson, A).
May 5, 2017 Filing 47 EX PARTE APPLICATION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment by defendants. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Warner, Paul) Modified on 5/8/2017 (Benson, A). Modified on 5/8/2017 (Krueger, M).
May 1, 2017 Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/1/2017: In light of Defendant Azita Alizadeh's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time (ECF No. #43 ) to file her opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. #29 ), the Court continued the hearing date to 7/13/2017. The Court will hear the motion as to all Defendants on that date in order to best effectuate judicial economy. However, the remaining Defendants' oppositions continue to be due on 5/4/2017 and the replies to those oppositions due on 5/11/2017. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
May 1, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/26/17: HEARING as to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment continued to 7/13/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Opposition due June 29, 2017, and reply due on July 6, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
April 21, 2017 Filing 43 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Azita Alizadeh for Continue summary judgment motion to allow def. Azita Alizadeh to conduct discovery needed to oppose motion FRCP 56(d). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order reopening discovery granted April 21, 2017, #2 Proposed Order Proposed order on this application)(Kashani, Mir)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/21/2017 ORDERING this Court ORDERS discovery in this action REOPENED for the time between 4/24/2017 and 7/26/2017. (Reader, L)
April 20, 2017 Filing 41 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Azita Alizadeh to Reopen Discovery for 90 days. (Attachments: #1 STIPULATION of all parties to Reopen Discovery, #2 Proposed Order)(Kashani, Mir) Modified on 4/21/2017 (Krueger, M).
April 18, 2017 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/18/2017: Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(1), Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Sanctions (ECF No. #39 ) shall be noticed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Counsel for Plaintiff shall contact the Clerk for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for available law and motion dates, and re-notice the motion before the Magistrate Judge with the proper time and date. Accordingly, the 5/18/2017 hearing before District Judge Troy L. Nunley is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
April 14, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for DISCOVERY SANCTIONS by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K)(Jennings, Guy)
February 22, 2017 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/22/2017: The Court, having reviewed Defendant Azita Alizadeh's Ex Parte Application (ECF No. #37 ) for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement (ECF No. #29 ), hereby GRANTS the application. The hearing set for 3/9/2017 is hereby VACATED and RESET for 5/18/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Defendant's opposition to be due 4/27/2017 and Plaintiff's reply to be due 5/4/2017. Discovery shall remain closed. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
February 21, 2017 Filing 37 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Azita Alizadeh for Continuance of SJ motion against Azita Alizadeh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kashani, Mir) Modified on 2/22/2017 (Becknal, R).
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/13/2017 ORDERING Attorney Paul A. Warner for Defendant Mitra Alizadeh, attorney Mir Saied Kashani terminated. (Reader, L)
February 6, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney and Proposed Order by Mitra Alizadeh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Substituting Attorney)(Kashani, Mir)
February 6, 2017 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/6/2017: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Mitra Alizadeh's Notice of Substitution of Attorney (ECF No. #33 ). Pursuant Local Rule 182(g), Substitution of Attorneys require the approval of the Court. Accordingly, Defendant is hereby ORDERED to re-file the substitution of attorneys with a proposed order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
February 6, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by Mitra Alizadeh. (Kashani, Mir)
February 3, 2017 Filing 32 EXHIBIT 17 to the Declaration of G. Patrick Jennings in support of #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20, #4 Exhibit 21, #5 Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibit 25, #9 Exhibit 26, #10 Exhibit 27, #11 Exhibit 28, #12 Exhibit 29, #13 Exhibit 30, #14 Exhibit 31, #15 Exhibit 32, #16 Exhibit 33, #17 Exhibit 34, #18 Exhibit 35, #19 Exhibit 36) (Jennings, Guy)
February 3, 2017 Filing 31 EXHIBIT 1 to the Declaration of G. Patrick Jennings in support of #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16) (Jennings, Guy)
February 3, 2017 Filing 30 EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Michael Gabrielson in support of #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Michael Gabrielson, #2 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Michael Gabrielson, #3 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Michael Gabrielson, #4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Paul Enjalran, #5 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Paul Enjalran, #6 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Beverly McFarland, #7 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Beferly McFarland) (Jennings, Guy)
February 3, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by United States of America. Motion Hearing SET for 3/9/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Declaration G. Patrick Jennings, #4 Declaration Michael Gabrielson, #5 Declaration Paul Enjalran, #6 Declaration Beverly McFarland, #7 Proof of Service) (Jennings, Guy)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/26/16 ORDERING the last day to complete fact and expert discovery in this case shall be 3/1/17. All other terms of the Pretrial Scheduling Order shall remain in effect.(Washington, S)
September 23, 2016 Filing 27 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Discovery by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/12/2015 ORDERING that all discovery shall be completed by 10/6/2016. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/8/2016. All dispositive motions shall be heard no later than 4/6/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file, not later than 7/6/2017, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. Jury Trial set for 9/11/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Zignago, K.)
September 17, 2015 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
August 21, 2015 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/21/2015: Pursuant to the Notice of Bankruptcy Termination (ECF No. #23 ), this case is hereby REOPENED. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 30 days of this Minute Order. Failure to timely file may result in the imposition of sanctions. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 21, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Termination of Bankruptcy and Request for Status Conference by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
February 20, 2015 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/20/2015: Based on the Notice of Bankruptcy filed by Defendant Michael Mehran Alizadeh (ECF No. #21 ), this action is hereby STAYED and is now ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. All dates and pending motions, including Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process (ECF No. #9 ) are VACATED. The case may be reopened at the request of the parties. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
February 18, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Mehran Alizadeh by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
November 14, 2014 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/14/2014: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Serve and to Extend Deadlines (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 11/20/2014 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
November 13, 2014 Filing 19 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Mitra Alizadeh. Attorney Kashani, Mir Saied added.(Kashani, Mir)
November 12, 2014 Filing 18 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Voyager Restaurant Group Inc.. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added.(Warner, Paul)
November 12, 2014 Filing 17 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Suede Blue Inc.. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added.(Warner, Paul)
November 12, 2014 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Phoenix Restaurant Group Inc.. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added.(Warner, Paul)
November 12, 2014 Filing 15 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Pegasus Restaurant Group Inc.. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added.(Warner, Paul)
November 12, 2014 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Lake Orta Corporation. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added.(Warner, Paul)
November 12, 2014 Filing 13 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Endeavor Restaurant Group Inc.. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added.(Warner, Paul)
November 12, 2014 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Mehran Alizadeh. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added.(Warner, Paul)
November 12, 2014 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Abolghassem Alizadeh. Attorney Warner, Paul Anthony added.(Warner, Paul)
September 30, 2014 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Azita Alizadeh. Attorney Kashani, Mir Saied added.(Kashani, Mir)
September 26, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION for 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Serve Process by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/30/2014 ALLOWING the United States to continue to attempt to serve the defendants with a copy of the summons and complaint until 9/26/2014; ALLOWING the United States to commence discovery limited to fact questions which may aid service of process, effective on the date this order is entered. (Michel, G)
June 27, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Serve Process by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Proof of Service)(Jennings, Guy)
June 10, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Pegasus Restaurant Group Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Guy Patrick Jennings* *P.O. Box 683* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Sant Agata, S)
May 22, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Endeavor Restaurant Group Inc., Phoenix Restaurant Group Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Guy Patrick Jennings* *United States Department of Justice* *P.O. Box 683* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Meuleman, A)
May 22, 2014 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America.(Jennings, Guy)
February 28, 2014 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Abolghassem Alizadeh, Azita Alizadeh, Mehran Alizadeh, Mitra Alizadeh, Capital City Concepts Inc., Lake Orta Corporation, North Valley Food Service LLC, Suede Blue Inc., Voyager Restaurant Group Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *G. Patrick Jennings* *U.S. Department of Justice* *P.O. Box 683, Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, D.C. 20044-0683*. (Meuleman, A)
February 28, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Meuleman, A)
February 28, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and to Reduce Tax Assessments to Judgment against All Defendants by United States. Attorney Jennings, Guy Patrick added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jennings, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Alizadeh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abolghassem Alizadeh
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehran Alizadeh
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suede Blue Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital City Concepts Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azita Alizadeh
Represented By: Mir Saied Kashani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitra Alizadeh
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Represented By: Mir Saied Kashani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voyager Restaurant Group Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegasus Restaurant Group Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Abe
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Valley Food Service LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Orta Corporation
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Restaurant Group Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Restaurant Group Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Orta Corporation Doing business as Crush #29
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Guy Patrick Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?