July 16, 2018 |
Filing
46
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/16/2018 recommending that Defendants' motion for summary judgment 37 be granted and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Within fourteen days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties.(Cannarozzi, N)
|
May 31, 2018 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/31/18 VACATING 39 the Findings and Recommendations. Defendant shall file a reply (if any) to plaintiffs opposition 43 withinfourteen days from the date this order is served. The motion for summary judgment will thenstand submitted. (Plummer, M)
|
April 16, 2018 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/18 GRANTING 40 Motion to vacate the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines. (Plummer, M)
|
April 11, 2018 |
Filing
39
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/11/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
38
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/08/18 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion or a statement of no opposition. (Plummer, M)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/29/2017 GRANTING 24 Motion for Leave to file Late Objections construed as Motion for Relief from Judgment. The 22 Order and 23 Judgment are VACATED. This matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. Plaintiff shall respond timely to each and every future court order that requires action. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of the action with prejudice. (Donati, J)
|
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/09/17 ORDERING that The Clerk shall send plaintiff a blank summons, one USM-285 form and instructions for service of process on defendant Clough. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall return the att ached Notice of Submission of documents with the completed blank summons and USM-285 form, which shall be completed to include a valid address for service of process on defendant Clough. No extensions of time to comply with this order will be grante d. Failure to comply with this order will result in the denial of plaintiff'smotion for leave to file late objections and the confirmation of the 23 03/14/17 judgment. The court will not reconsider the 23 03/20/17 judgment or reopen this action unless plaintiff timely files the completed summons and USM-285 form. (Benson, A.)
|
September 9, 2016 |
Filing
21
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/08/16 recommending that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
16
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/07/15 recommending that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
February 10, 2015 |
Filing
12
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tracy Fidel Alford signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/9/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forwar d to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
|
April 4, 2014 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/4/2014 ORDERING 8 Order is VACATED; Court will, in due course, screen plaintiff's complaint. (Waggoner, D)
|
April 2, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/01/14 ordering plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required trust account statement. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
|