Segovia v. State of California, et al.
Plaintiff: David Segovia
Defendant: State of California, New Folsom Prison, State Medical Board, Nguyen and Shafer
Case Number: 2:2014cv00715
Filed: March 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/2/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/28/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Yin, K)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/20/16 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff 1 USM 285 form, instruction sheet and a copy of the 1/16/15 amended complaint to be completed and returned with the attached Notice of Submission of documents within 60 days. (Plummer, M)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/8/16 DENYING 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/14/2016 ORDERING that the 12 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED in full. All defendants other than Peters, Convalecer and Moon are DISMISSED from this action. (Zignago, K.)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/11/16 ORDERING service is appropriate for defendants Peters, Convalecer and Moon. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff 3 USM-285 forms, 1 summons, instr uction sheet, and a copy of the 1/16/15 amended complaint to be completed and returned within 30 days. The clerk of the court is directed to assign a district judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that all defendants other than Peters, Vonvalecer and Moon be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of David Segovia signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/18/2014. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segovia v. State of California, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Segovia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Folsom Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Medical Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?