Creer v. City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Latasha Nicole Creer
Defendant: City of Vallejo, Knight, Long and Martinez
Case Number: 2:2014cv01428
Filed: June 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/19/17 ORDERING that this Action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2). CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/9/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff show cause in writing within 14 days of the date of this order as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The hearing on 53 Motion to D ismiss, and 54 Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 2/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. On or before 2/3/2017, plaintiff shall file statements of opposition or non-opposition to defendants' motions. (Kastilahn, A)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/5/16 ORDERING that Defendants' 59 request to seal is GRANTED. Defendants shall contact the Clerk to submit the appropriate items for filing under seal. Plaintiff shall not file on the public docket any item ordered filed under seal. (Kastilahn, A)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/21/2016 ORDERING that plaintiff's 43 motion to compel is GRANTED. Defendants' 47 motion to compel is GRANTED. Defendants' request to take discovery after the discovery deadline is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/13/2016 Granting 44 Application for an Order shortening Time. Defendants' 47 Motion to Compel Discovery is SET for 10/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Buzo, P) Modified on 10/14/2016 (Donati, J).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 39 Motion for Sanctions and granting 38 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/7/16. Defendants shall produce to plaintiff transcripts of the interviews at issue on or before November 9, 2016. Defendants shall redact the names of any Vallejo Police Department Officers and replace those names with number identifiers.(Kaminski, H)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/20/16 ORDERING that in order to protect the confidentiality of the records produced by defendant said records disclosed are designated as Confidential Material." (See order for further details.) (Kastilahn, A)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/28/15 ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is SET for 10/30/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Plaintiff shall file and serve a status report on or before 10/16/2015, and defendants shall file and serve a status report on or before 10/23/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting in full 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/23/15. Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants are directed to file an answer to the amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/16/2015 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 6 motion to dismiss be Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE 10 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/4/2015. Action denominated 2:14-CV-1603 MCE AC is REASSIGNED to Distict Judge Mendez and Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd for all further proceedings. The caption on documents filed shall be shown as 2:14-CV-1603 JAM DAD. (Marciel, M)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/24/14. The Clerk is directed to issue process and send plaintiff an instruction sheet for service of process by the United States Marshal (U SM), four USM-285 forms, a summons form, and a copy of plaintiff's 1 complaint. Within 30 days after this order is served, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the required documents. Within 10 days after submitting the required materials to the USM Service, plaintiff shall file with this court a declaration stating the date she submitted the required documents to the USM. Within 30 days after receiving the necessary materials from plaintiff, the USM is directed to serve process on defendants without prepayment of costs. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creer v. City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Nicole Creer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?