Johns 1994 Family Trust, UTA dated July 13, 1994, et al v. Sunbeam Products, et al
Plaintiff: Johns 1994 Family Trust, UTA dated July 13, 1994 and Stuart Johns
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc. and Patton
Case Number: 2:2014cv02760
Filed: November 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING ACTION signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/21/15 ORDERING that, pursuant to the FRCP Rule 41(A)(1 )(a)(ii), and the parties' stipulation, that this action is be DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice; each side bearing its own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER MODIFYING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/1/15 re 25 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the 10/5/15 date for disclosure of experts and production of reports is amended to 12/5/15; the 11/9/15 date for disclosure of rebuttal experts and production of their reports is amended to 1/15/16; the 2/1/16 date for final completion of discovery is amended to 2/20/16. (Meuleman, A)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/8/15 extending Defendant, SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. dba JARDEN CONSUMER SOLUTIONS' time to respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Set One and Plaintiff's Request for Production, Set One to and including Friday June 12, 2015. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/21/2015 ORDERING that defendant Sunbeam Products Inc. dba Jarden Consumer Solutions', time to respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Set One andPlaintiff's Request for Production, Set One is extended to and including Friday 5/29/2015. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johns 1994 Family Trust, UTA dated July 13, 1994, et al v. Sunbeam Products, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johns 1994 Family Trust, UTA dated July 13, 1994
Represented By: Mark Edward Arruti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Johns
Represented By: Mark Edward Arruti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: Graham Matthew Cridland
Represented By: Charles Stephen Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?