Paskenta Band of Nomlaki Indians et al v. Crosby et al
Plaintiff: Paskenta Band of Nomlaki Indians and Paskenta Enterprises Corporation
Defendant: Ines Crosby, John Crosby, Leslie Lohse, Larry Lohse, Ted Pata, Juan Pata, Chris Pata, Sherry Myers, Frank James, Umpqua Bank, Umpqua Holdings Corporation, Garth Moore, Garth Moore Insurance and Financial Services, Inc., Associated Pension Consultants, Inc., Haness & Associates, LLC, Robert M. Haness, The Patriot Gold & Silver Exchange, Inc., Norman R. Ryan and Quicken Loans Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00538
Filed: March 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Tehama
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/26/2020 GRANTING Plaintiffs 467 Motion to Vacate Stay of Proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to lift the current stay and to denominate this matter as an active case. (Zignago, K.)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/10/2020 GRANTING 469 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The law firm of Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP is TERMED as counsel of record for Defendants Ines Crosby, John Crosby, Leslie Lohse, L arry Lohse, Ted Pata, Juan Pata, Chris Pata, Sherry Myers, and Frank James, effective upon the filing of a proof of service of this signed Order on said Defendants. Defendants will be proceeding in propia persona, pending the submission of any substitution of counsel. (Kastilahn, A)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/4/2019. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate the Stay of Proceedings is extended by sixty (60) days to allow Defendants to secure substitu te counsel. That extension also applies to any filing in response to Plaintiffs' Motion to be submitted by APC. Should said parties choose to do so, they are accordingly directed to respond to Plaintiffs' motion not later than February 3, 2020. Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP is ordered to notify Defendants of this Order, notwithstanding the pending Motion toWithdraw as Counsel. (Deutsch, S)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 457 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/17/18 ORDERING that the Clerk is to REMOVE Dkt. Nos. 67-3, 67-4, 72-8, and 73-3 from the case file. Plaintiffs may file redacted copies of Dkt. Nos. 67-3, 67-4, 72-8, and 73-3. (Benson, A.)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER granting 441 Motion to stay Enforcement of order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/18/17. (Kaminski, H)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/26/2017 DENYING 382 , 388 Motions for Attorney's Fees; GRANTING 384 Motion for Attorney's Fees; FINDING that Cornerstone Community Bank is entitled to $1, 049,559.16 in attorney's fees and costs; OVERRULING 404 Objections to Bill of Costs; FINDING that Umpqua Bank, Umpqua Holdings Corporation, Cornerstone Community Bancorp, Cornerstone Community Bank, Garth Moore Insurance and Financial Services, Inc., Garth Moore, Associated Pension Consultants, Inc. are entitled to the full amounts provided in 383 , 385 , 386 , 387 Bills of Costs. (Michel, G.)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/10/2017 DENYING 366 Motion for Reconsideration. (Zignago, K.)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MENORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/19/2017 GRANTING 351 Defendants' Motion to Stay Case pending the resolution of criminal proceedings against Defendants, subject to three exceptions on pending motions 382 , 384 , 388 ; not later than 90 days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, and every 90 days thereafter until the stay is lifted, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report advising the Court as to the Status of the Criminal action. (Reader, L)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 413 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/27/2017 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 382 , 384 , and 388 Motions for Attorneys' Fees to 5/18/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that the opposition to each motion be filed by 4/20/2017; ORDERING that any replies be filed by 5/4/2017. (Michel, G.)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 FINAL JUDGMENT dated *2/21/17* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/21/17. Entered in favor of defendants: Cornerstone Community Bank; Cornerstone Community Bancorp; Jeffery Finck; Umpqua Bank; Umpqua Holdings Corp.; Garth Moore; Garth Moore Insurance andFinancial Services, Inc.; and Associated Pension Consultants, Inc.(Becknal, R)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/24/2017 DENYING 72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Michel, G.)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/2017. (Washington, S)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/10/2017 RELATED with 2:15-CV-538 MCE CMK REASSIGNING CASE 2:17-CR-6 TLN to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. for all further proceedings, and any dates currently se in 2:17-CR-6 are hereby VACATED; caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:17-CR-6 MCE; District Judge Troy L. Nunley no longer assigned to criminal case.(Reader, L)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/6/2017 ORDERING that Defendants GDK Consulting LLC and Greg Kesner are DISMISSED with Prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Reader, L)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/14/2016 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to restrict access to counsel's 324 Declaration. Defendants may refile a redacted version of the declaration and exhibits. (Zignago, K.)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/8/16 GRANTING 318 Ex Parte Application to CONTINUE the hearings on 298 , 303 Motion to Compel to 1/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. The parties shall meet and confer prior to the submission of the joint statement; the parties' joint statement 12/21/2016. (Washington, S)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/14/2016 DENYING Third-Party Defendants' 274 Motion for Judgment. (Jackson, T)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/18/16 ORDERING that Umpqua defendants' 228 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice as to plaintiffs' common law negligence, breach of contract, and aiding and abetting claims; APC's 269 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice as to plaintiffs' common law negligence claim, aiding and abetting claim, and punitive damages prayer; Moore's 275 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED with prejudice as to plaintiffs' common law negligence, aiding and abetting, and restitution/quasi-contract claims. (Benson, A)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/13/2016 MODIFYING the briefing schedule on 289 , 290 , 291 Motions for Summary Judgment; ORDERING the plaintiffs to file an opposition to said motions and any Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by 11/3/2016; ORDERING the Cornerstone Defendants to file replies in support of their motions and their opposition to any Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by 11/17/2016; ORDERING the plaintiffs to file any replies in support of any Cross- Motions for Summary Judgment by 11/24/2016; SETTING the Motion Hearing on 289 , 290 , 291 Motions for Summary Judgment and any Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment for 12/1/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Michel, G.)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/03/16 ORDERING that plaintiffs' deadline to file their Opposition to the 49 Motion to Dismiss is EXTENDED to 08/31/16; APCs Reply is due 14 days thereafter and APC shall re-notice the motion hearing in accordance with Local Rules and this Court's Individual Practices. (Benson, A)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/29/2016 ORDERING that the time for Defendants GDK Consulting and Greg Kesner to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 8/18/2016. If Defendants GDK Consulting and Greg Kesner file a motion to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint, Defendants will notice the motion for hearing on 10/6/2016. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion will be due on 9/22/2016, and Defendants reply brief will be due on 9/29/2016. (Zignago, K.)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/15/2016 GRANTING 173 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. The 156 Third-Party Complaint is DISMISSED with no leave to amend. (Zignago, K.)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/22/2016 ORDERING Defendant Associated Pension Consultants, LLC to respond to the 212 Third Amended Complaint by 7/10/2016. (Michel, G.)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/8/2016 ORDERING Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civ. Pro. 33(a)(1), that Plaintiffs may serve an additional ten (10) written interrogatories on Defendant John Crosby.(Reader, L)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/6/2016 ORDERING Defendants Cornerstone Community Bank, Cornerstone Community Bancorp, Jeffrey Finck to file an answer to the 212 Third Amended Complaint by 6/20/2016. (Michel, G.)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/1/16 ORDERING that Defendants Umpqua and APC shall have thirty (30) days from 5/20/16, up to and including 6/20/16, to file a responsive pleading in this matter. Plaintiff s' opposition to any such motion will be due thirty (30) days from the date Defendants' motion is filed; and Defendants' reply in support of any such motion will be due fourteen (14) days from the date Plaintiffs' opposition is filed.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/15/2016 ORDERING that Cornerstone Defendants' 139 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART with leave to amend. APC's 143 Motion to Dismiss is GRANT ED with leave to amend. Umpqua Defendants' 145 Motionto Dismiss is GRANTED with leave to amend. Haness defendant's 141 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs are GRANTED thirty (30) days to file a Third Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/12/16 ORDERING that the hearing date for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production by Defendants Cornerstone Community Bank, Cornerstone Community Bancorp and Jeffrey Finck shall be moved to May 4, 2016. (Becknal, R)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 10/13/15 ORDERING that Defendants' request to certify for interlocutory appeal the August 14, 2015 ruling, denying Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding the production of documents for purposes of discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/5/15. (Kastilahn, A)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/1/15 re: 133 ORDERING Leave to Amend. (Meuleman, A)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/9/2015 GRANTING 113 Ex Parte Application. These defendants are not required to respond to the First Amended Complaint but are instead ORDERED to Respondent to the forthcoming Second Amended Complaint on 11/2/2015, pursuant to 107 Order. (Donati, J)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 8/28/2015 ORDERING 110 Within 10 days of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall dismiss the CRP Entities without prejudiced from the instant action; Notwithstanding the foregoing dismi ssal without prejudice, because the Plaintiffs and certain Defendants dispute the lawful ownership of the Subject Interests and the ancillary entitlement to proceeds, distributions, and other economic benefits related thereto, and because this Courts ultimate disposition of this case will likely determine the lawful ownership of the Subject Interests and ancillary entitlements, the Court shall retain jurisdiction over the CRP Entities for the purpose of enforcing this Order and matters related t hereto, including issuing an order at the conclusion of this case directing the CRP Entities to distribute proceeds, distributions, and other economic benefits related to the Subject Interests to whichever party(ies) the Court determines is the lawful owner thereof. (Reader, L)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/14/15 DENYING 72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Meuleman, A)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/13/15 ORDERING that MOTIONS to DISMISS the First Amended Complaint 44 , 46 , 50 , 51 , 53 and 54 are GRANTED in PART and DENIED in part. Plaintiff is granted (21) days leave from the date on which this order is filed to file a Second Amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies in any dismissed claim that was not dismissed without leave to amend. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/5/15 DECLINING to sign the 4/24/15 Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Manzer, C)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 7/29/15 ORDERING that the Clerk is instructed to remove Dkt. No. [72-2] from the case file; and Plaintiffs may file the attached redacted copy of Dkt. No. [72-2]. (Kastilahn, A)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/28/2015. (Zignago, K.)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/13/15 DENYING the sealing request re: 80 Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Meuleman, A)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/10/15: Plaintiffs' 77 Ex Parte Application for an OST is DENIED. (Kaminski, H)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/9/15 ORDERING for the stated reasons, Defendants' motion for a stay pending arbitration is DENIED and Plaintiffs' counter-motion to stay the arbitration is GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/13/15 ORDERING that Defendant shall have twenty-eight (28) days from 4/8/15, up to and indcluding 5/6/2015, to file a responsive pleading in this matter.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paskenta Band of Nomlaki Indians et al v. Crosby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paskenta Band of Nomlaki Indians
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paskenta Enterprises Corporation
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ines Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Lohse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lohse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Pata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Pata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Pata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth Moore Insurance and Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pension Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haness & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Haness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Patriot Gold & Silver Exchange, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman R. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?