Givens v. County of Sacramento, et al.
Plaintiff: Francois P. Givens
Defendant: The County of Sacramento, Scott R. Jones, Adam J. Taylor, Ken L. Becker and Witherspoon
Case Number: 2:2015cv00720
Filed: April 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/4/2018 ORDERING 93 Request for clarification filed by Francois P. Givens is GRANTED; The records of the court's financial department indicate that it last received a payment of $60.20 for PLRA fees from plaintiff on 4/3/2018, and that all of plaintiff's PLRA fees for this case have been paid in full; Therefore, no further PLRA fees are due for this case. (cc: Accounting and Trust Dept., CSP-Solano)(Reader, L)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/24/2017 DENYING 76 Plaintiff's Motion for sanctions; Plaintiffs request to modify the scheduling order is DENIED; Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is DENIED; Plaintif f's request for increased access to the prison library is DENIED; all discovery and motion practice, except for non-frivolous motions for emergency relief, are STAYED until the 11/29/2017 settlement conference; if the action does not settle, the court will set a briefing schedule with respect to plaintiff's pending motion to compel. 78 (Reader, L)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/6/2017 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Francois P. Givens via video conferencing at 11/29/2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom #27 before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Sac) (Washington, S) Modified on 9/7/2017 (Washington, S).
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/17 ORDERING the Warden of Solano State Prison to produce Francois P. Givens, CDCR #AX-1773, a necessary and material witness in a settlement before Magist rate Judge Deborah Barnes at the U.S. District Court, 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814 in Courtroom #27 on 9/27/17, at 10:00 a.m. The Warden is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide the custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/14/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for an Extension to respond to defendants' first set of written discovery requests 66 is GRANTED; Responses are due by 9/5/2017. Plaintiff's Request to Compel Discovery from defendants is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/31/2017 ORDERING 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice as premature. (Reader, L)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's 62 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice as premature. (Zignago, K.)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/16/2017 ORDERING 58 plaintiff's request for an order directing the United States Marshal to serve subpoenas for records on the mentioned third parties is DENIED. (Reader, L)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/17/17 ORDERING that initial disclosures are due no later than 4/13/2017, all motions, except as to discovery-related matters, shall be filed by 4/26/2018, all discovery shall be completed by 3/29/2018, all discovery motions shall be filed no later than 2/22/2018, Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/11/2018 and rebuttal disclosures due no later than 2/8/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM commanding the Warden to produce the inmate to testify by video-conferencing before the United States District Court signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/22/17. (Kaminski, H)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/21/17 ORDERING plaintiff's "ex parte request for default judgment" (ECF No. 37 ) is DENIED, and the answer is properly filed. (Becknal, R)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/15/16 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature 32 Request that issuance of subpoenas. Any discovery is STAYED until the initial status (pretrial scheduling) conference. (Washington, S)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/12/2016 DENYING 30 Request for Reconsideration. (Michel, G.)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/7/2016 ORDERING the Clerk to re-designate this action as a non-prisoner pro se case. Service is appropriate as to defendants Taylor, Beck and the County of Sacramento in regards to specific cla ims identified in this order. All other claims and defendants are DISMISSED with Prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process accordingly. Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall provide the US Marshal with all the necessary paperwork and within 10 days thereafter, file a brief statement to the court that such documents have been submitted to the USM. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:15-cv-0720 JAM KJN (PS). (Donati, J)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/24/15 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Francois P. Givens and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/6/15 denying 9 Motion. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens v. County of Sacramento, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois P. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken L. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?