Mitchell v. Snowden et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Mitchell
Defendant: Snowden, Vance, Larios, Seaton and Compton
Case Number: 2:2015cv01167
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/28/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss 15 , reconsidered on remand pursuant to order of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals 43 be granted. MOTION to DISMISS 15 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/05/18 GRANTING 60 request for judicial notice and DENYING 59 Motion to Strike. The parties' briefing is now complete and the matter is submitted. (Plummer, M)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/26/2018 GRANTING 52 Stipulation. Defendants to file a response to Plaintiff's brief re equitable tolling no later than 5/14/2018. Plaintiff to file his reply brief no later than 6/4/2018. (Henshaw, R)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/27/2017 SCHEDULING a Status Conference on Wednesday, 1/17/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 26 (AC), before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (York, M)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/06/17 ORDERING that the Clerk of Court is directed to immediately contact Ms. Sujean Park, Alternative Dispute Resolution Coordinator, for the purpose of locating an attorney admitted to practice in this court who is willing to accept this appointment. (cc: ADR Director) (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/29/16 ordering plaintiffs motion filed September 27,2016, which requests both extended time and appointment of counsel, 34 , is denied.(Plummer, M)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/14/16 ordering plaintiff's status report 30 , is construed as an objection to the magistrate judge's recommendation that this action be dismissed with prejudice 23 , and to any and all findings and fact and conclusions of law on which that recommendation is based. (Plummer, M)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/10/2016 ORDERING this court's 5/12/2016 Order and Findings and Recommendations 21 are VACATED. IT IS RECOMMENDED that that defendants' motion to dismiss 15 be GRANTED; and this action be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Toy L. Nunley; Objections due within 21 days. (Yin, K) Modified on 6/10/2016 (Yin, K).
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/12/16 ORDERING that the clerk of the court shall randomly assign a district judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Troy L. Nunley randomly assigned to this act ion. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss 15 be denied. Should the district judge adopt these findings and recommendations, defendants be required to file and serve an answer to the complaint within 21 days after the filing date of the district judge's order. Should the district judge adopt these findings and recommendations, this case be referred back to the undersigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. MOTION to DISMISS 15 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Michael J. Mitchell signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/23/2015. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward t o the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Snowden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?