Heilman v. Whitten, et al
Plaintiff: Thomas John Heilman
Defendant: A. Whitten, A. Gonzales, M. Dooley, E. Mendonsa and V. Singh
Case Number: 2:2015cv01585
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/7/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's IFP status remains REVOKED. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff and on the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc: USCA) (Zignago, K.)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/19/2017 RECOMMENDING that 35 Motion to Dismiss be granted and this action be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/25/16 ordering that plaintiffs motion to remove incorrect charges from inmate trust account 36 is granted as follows: The September 25, 2015 order directing prison officials to deduct the fi ling fee for this action from plaintiffs trust account is hereby VACATED; The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the CDCR Inmate Trust Account Office, 1515 S Street, Sacramento, California 95814; and the CDCR Inmate Trust Account Office is directed to remove the obligation of the new case filing fee for 2:15-cv-1585 MCE CKD from plaintiffs inmate trust account, as it has been paid in full. (cc: CDC Trust account office) (Plummer, M)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/7/16 ORDERING that defendants' motion to revoke plaintiff's IFP status (ECF No. 22 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall pay the $400 filing fee. It is noted that the Court is in receipt of this payment by Plaintiff; and the Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/14/16 GRANTING 18 Motion for judicial notice. (Dillon, M)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/17/16 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 1/25/16 12 are ADOPTED IN FULL; All Defendants and claims, except the First Amendment retaliation claims against Defendants Whitten, Dooley, and Mendosa, are DISMISSED from this action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/25/2016 ORDERING service is appropriate for M. Dooley, E. Mendonsa, A. Whitten; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and return ed within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. IT IS RECOMMENDED that all defendants and claims be dismissed from this action except First Amendment retaliation claims against defendants Whitten, Dooley and Mendosa. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Thomas John Heilman signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/25/15. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heilman v. Whitten, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas John Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Mendonsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?