Prado v. Swarthout et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro Prado
Defendant: Gary Swarthout, E. Arnold, G. Matteson, D. Blackwell, J. Jimenez, N. Clark, Fletes, Hammond, Allean and Zamora
Case Number: 2:2015cv01866
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/10/19 ORDERING that 45 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted in part and rejected in part. 36 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. (Kaminski, H)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/27/2019 GRANTING 48 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants to file and serve their objections on or before 3/12/2019. (Henshaw, R)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 02/04/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 36 be granted in part and denied in part. This case should proceed only on plaintiff's ADA claim. Motion for Summary Judgment 36 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/22/18 DENYING 28 Motion to Compel. (Plummer, M)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/26/18 ORDERING within 14 days of the date of this order defendants shall file an opposition, file a statement of non-opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel, or otherwise sh ow why plaintiff's motion to compel should not be granted. The 08/07/17 Discovery and Scheduling Order 27 is amended as follows: All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 4/26/18. In all other respects, the Discovery and Scheduling order remains the same. (Plummer, M)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/30/2017 ADOPTING IN FULL 22 Findings and Recommendations; DISMISSING this action against Defendant J. Jimenez without prejudice. (Michel, G.)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/22/17 Recommending that Defendant Jimenez be dismissed. These Findings and Recommendations will be submitted to U.S. District Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 04/24/17 ORDERING that the ADA claims against all defendants in their individual capacities are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the First Amendment claims against all defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and Plaintiff's requests for injunctive relief are dismissed as moot. (Benson, A)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/23/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's claims against defendant Jimenz are DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days. Service is appropriate for E. Arnold, D. Blackwell, G. Matteson, and Gary Swarthout. The Clerk shall provide plaintiff with forms for service which plaintiff may complete and return within 30 days. Plaintiff shall return the Notice of Submission or Amendment with response. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the ADA claims against all defendants in their individual capacities be dismissed with prejudice; the First Amendment claims against all defendants be dismissed without prejudice; and plaintiff's requests for injunctive relief be dismissed as moot. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/15/16 granting 10 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 7/15/16. (Plummer, M)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/13/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Alejandro Prado and forward payment to the court until the balanc e is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prado v. Swarthout et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Prado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Matteson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fletes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?