Jackson v. Bick et al
Plaintiff: Raymond D. Jackson, Sr.
Defendant: J. Bick, N. Aguilera, L. Crosson, M. DiTomas, Jackie Clark, D.W. Horell and J. Lewis
Case Number: 2:2015cv02066
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/07/19 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/7/2018 ADOPTING 51 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 49 motion for injunctive relief. (York, M)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER adopting in full 48 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/25/18. Plaintiff's 46 motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. Plaintiff's 46 request for a stay is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/5/2018 RECOMMENDING Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief be denied. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/30/2018 ADOPTING 48 findings and recommendations. Defendant Seabrooks is DISMISSED from this action. (Zignago, K.)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/19/2018 ORDERING the Clerk shall assign this matter to a district judge; plaintiff's 46 motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; and within 20 days, plaint iff shall provide the court with further information so that defendant Clarke may be properly served. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendant Seabrooks' 27 motion to dismiss be granted; defendant Seabrook be dismissed from this action; plaintiff's 46 motion for preliminary injunction be denied; and plaintiff's 46 request for a stay be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/25/18 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Raymond D. Jackson, Sr. on 5/10/18 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: EFB and OTCD)(Plummer, M)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/08/17 ORDERING that attorney David W. Bonilla is appointed as limited purpose counsel in the above entitled matter. The appointment is for the limited purpose of assisting plaintiff with preparing for and participating in a settlement conference. David Bonilla's appointment will terminate 15 days after completion of the settlement conference, or any continuation of the settlement conference. (Plummer, M)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/17/2017 GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel. This case is REFERRED to the court's Pro Bono Coordinator, Sujean Park, to locate counsel willing to represent plaintiff in this case for purposes of settlement only; and After counsel is appointed, the court will schedule a settlement conference. (York, M)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/23/2017 ORDERING Defendants Aguilera, Bick, Crosson, DiTomas, Horch, and Lewis to show cause within 21 days from the date of this order, why default should not be entered. (cc: Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/21/2017 GRANTING 29 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file and serve a response to 27 Motion to Dismiss. (Henshaw, R)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/03/17 granting 17 Motion to Stay service of the complaint on defendants to permit him to amend his complaint. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file any amended complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this district. (Plummer, M)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/23/17 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Raymond D. Jackson, Sr. and forward payment to the court until the bal ance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial) (Dillon, M)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/21/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Bick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond D. Jackson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. DiTomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W. Horell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?