Smith v. Siskiyou County Jail et al.
Plaintiff: James Anthony Smith
Defendant: Siskiyou County Jail, Siskiyou County Jail Medical Staff and Houston
Case Number: 2:2015cv02534
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/31/2020 GRANTING 51 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days. Defendant's 45 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. (Zignago, K.)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/24/20 DENYING 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The court sua sponte grants plaintiff an extension of time to file his opposition or statement of no opposition to defendant Millers March 11, 2020 motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his response to the motion to dismiss within 30 days from the date this order is served. (Plummer, M)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/30/2019 DENYING 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Huang, H)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/1/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed with prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief could be granted, and the Clerk be directed to enter judgment and close the case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/11/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 15 request for an extension of time to file an amended complaint and the amended complaint is deemed timely filed. The amended complaint is DISMISSED with leave to file a second amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/22/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of James Anthony Smith. The CDC is directed to forward to the Clerk of Court the initial partial filing fee, if funds exist, as well as payments from plaintiff's account each time the amount exceeds $10. The clerk is DIRECTED to serve the CDC with this order. (cc CDCR- Prisoner Payments)(Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Siskiyou County Jail et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Anthony Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siskiyou County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siskiyou County Jail Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?