Sierra v. Director of CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alan Sierra
Defendant: Director of Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Jennifer Beretto, A. Adams, Galen Church, Reynolds, Miller, Golff, Smith and Williams
Case Number: 2:2016cv01067
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/25/2018 VACATING the 5/17/2018 findings and recommendations 78 . (Yin, K)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/16/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/11/2018 GRANTING plaintiff 30 days to pay the $400.00 filing fee; failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this action. (Yin, K)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/2/2017 VACATING without prejudice 56 Motion for Assignment of Conflict Counsel, 58 Motion for Order to Remove False Report, and 60 Motion to Extract Records. (Henshaw, R)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/2017 GRANTING 68 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to submit payment for the filing fee within 45 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/4/17 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 1/26/17, are ADOPTED in full; and Plaintiff's applications to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos 15 and 35 ) are DENIED and plaintiff is ORDERED TO PAY the filing fee within thirty days of the date of this order; failure to pay the filing fee will result in dismissal of this action. (Becknal, R)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/17/17 GRANTING 48 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 15 days from the date of this order in which to file objections to the findings and recommendations.(Dillon, M)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/17 ORDERING that the following motions are vacated: plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel 16 , plaintiffs motions for injunctive relief 17 , 18 , pl aintiffs motions to amend 19 and 36 , plaintiffs motion for law library access 21 , plaintiffs motion for extension of time 37 , Also RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs applications to proceed in forma pauperis 15 , 35 be denied; and plaintiff be ordered to pay the filing fee. MOTIONS 15 , 35 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/23/16 ordering within 14 days of the date of this order, Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson shall file the status report discussed above. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson, (cc: Monica Anderson, Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/1/16 ORDERING that 24 Findings and Recommendations are VACATED; Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint; if plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, the July 28, 2016 findings and recommendations will be reinstated; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff the form for a civil rights complaint by a prisoner.(Dillon, M)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/28/2016 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 15 application to proceed ifp be denied; and plaintiff be ordered to pay the filing fee. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra v. Director of CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alan Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Beretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?