July 11, 2022 |
Filing
100
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/11/2022 ADOPTING 99 Findings and Recommendations in full. This action is DISMISSED and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 15, 2022 |
Filing
99
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/15/2022 DENYING 98 Motion for Extension of Time and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
January 26, 2022 |
Filing
95
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/2022 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
November 18, 2021 |
Filing
94
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/18/2021 VACATING 92 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 93 Motion for Extension of Time and GRANTING plaintiff 60 days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
|
November 4, 2021 |
Filing
92
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/4/2021 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
September 24, 2021 |
Filing
91
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/24/21 ORDERING that plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file a response to the 8/24/21 order.(Plummer, M)
|
August 24, 2021 |
Filing
90
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/24/21, DISMISSING 34 plaintiff's amended complaint but for those claims found potentially colorable, as discussed in this order. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint or a notice that he intends to proceed on the potentially colorable claims.(Plummer, M)
|
July 8, 2021 |
Filing
89
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/8/2021 VACATING 83 Order; GRANTING Request to Proceed IFP; and GRANTING Plaintiff 30 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
|
March 29, 2021 |
Filing
83
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/29/21 ORDERING plaintiff is granted twenty-one days from the date of this order to pay the $400 filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this order on plaintiffs address of record and at the following address: 2300 Griffith Avenue, Los Angeles, California, 90011-1602.(Plummer, M)
|
July 25, 2018 |
Filing
81
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/25/2018 VACATING the 5/17/2018 findings and recommendations 78 . (Yin, K)
|
May 17, 2018 |
Filing
78
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/16/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
April 11, 2018 |
Filing
77
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/11/2018 GRANTING plaintiff 30 days to pay the $400.00 filing fee; failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this action. (Yin, K)
|
October 2, 2017 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/2/2017 VACATING without prejudice 56 Motion for Assignment of Conflict Counsel, 58 Motion for Order to Remove False Report, and 60 Motion to Extract Records. (Henshaw, R)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing
69
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/2017 GRANTING 68 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to submit payment for the filing fee within 45 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/4/17 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 1/26/17, are ADOPTED in full; and Plaintiff's applications to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos 15 and 35 ) are DENIED and plaintiff is ORDERED TO PAY the filing fee within thirty days of the date of this order; failure to pay the filing fee will result in dismissal of this action. (Becknal, R)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/17/17 GRANTING 48 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 15 days from the date of this order in which to file objections to the findings and recommendations.(Dillon, M)
|
January 26, 2017 |
Filing
46
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/17 ORDERING that the following motions are vacated: plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel 16 , plaintiffs motions for injunctive relief 17 , 18 , pl aintiffs motions to amend 19 and 36 , plaintiffs motion for law library access 21 , plaintiffs motion for extension of time 37 , Also RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs applications to proceed in forma pauperis 15 , 35 be denied; and plaintiff be ordered to pay the filing fee. MOTIONS 15 , 35 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
December 23, 2016 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/23/16 ordering within 14 days of the date of this order, Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson shall file the status report discussed above. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson, (cc: Monica Anderson, Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
|
September 1, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/1/16 ORDERING that 24 Findings and Recommendations are VACATED; Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint; if plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, the July 28, 2016 findings and recommendations will be reinstated; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff the form for a civil rights complaint by a prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|
July 28, 2016 |
Filing
24
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/28/2016 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 15 application to proceed ifp be denied; and plaintiff be ordered to pay the filing fee. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|