Hammler v. Hudson et al

Plaintiff: Allen Hammler
Defendant: Hudson, C. Romero and S. Serna
Case Number: 2:2016cv01153
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/17/18 GRANTING 52 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order to file his objections. (Coll, A)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/27/2018 DENYING 46 Motion to Submit Surreply, STRIKING 47 Surreply, and RECOMMENDING that 41 Motion to Dismiss be granted, that plaintiff's claims be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies, and that 43 Motion for Order Directing Warden to Render Medical Attention and Conduct Investigation be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 36 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/26/18 DENYING Defendants' 25 Motion to Require plaintiff to post security. (Benson, A.)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/13/18 ORDERING that plaintiff's motion to submit a surreply 31 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to require plaintiff to post security 25 be denied. Motion to Require Plaintiff to Post Security 25 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Allen Hammler signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/6/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to th e Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/2/2016 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit the required trust account statement. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp form. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammler v. Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Hammler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?