Kabede v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: |
Wondiyrad Kabede |
Defendant: |
Gary Brown, Kamala Harris, California Parole Board, Barnett, S. Heatley, James Jackson, Sam Wong and Jerry Dowdy |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01765 |
Filed: |
July 27, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Deborah Barnes |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 4, 2017 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/3/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 20 motion. (Yin, K)
|
July 11, 2017 |
Filing
17
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/10/17 ORDERING that plaintiffs request for assistance with any deportation proceedings is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs motion to voluntarily dismiss this case 16 be granted. MOTION 16 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
May 31, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/30/17 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in compliance with the court's order filed on 2/22/17. (Plummer, M)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
14
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/19/17: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 12 of the magistrate judge's order dismissing the complaint is denied. Within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint. The findings and recommendations filed February 22, 2017 9 are adopted in full. Plaintiff's Motion to Order Physical and Mental Exam 5 is denied. (Kaminski, H)
|
April 4, 2017 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/3/2017 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint.(Yin, K)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/21/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this district. Plaintiff's requ est for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to review documents (ECF No. 8 ) is DENIED. Clerk of the Court shall assign a district judge to this case. It is RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's Motion to Order Physical and Mental Exam (ECF No. 5 ) be denied. Randomly assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?