Cuff v. Department of State Hospitals (DSH) - Stockton et al
Plaintiff: Byron Dewayne Cuff
Defendant: Department of State Hospitals (DSH) - Stockton, California Health Care Facility, Harris, Ramos, E. Palmer, J. Celaya, Osuj, R. Cunningham and McCarthy
Case Number: 2:2016cv01999
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 02/06/19 ORDERING within 30 days of the filed date of this order, defendants Ramos and Ward shall file any dispositive, pretrial motions as described in the court's Discovery and Scheduling Order date 11/06/17 28 . (Plummer, M)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/29/18 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Byron Cuff on 1/29/19 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: CKD and OTCD)(Plummer, M)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/11/2018 SETTING a Settlement Conference for 1/29/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Within 10 days, plaintiff shall return the attached form notifying the court how he would like to attend the settlement conference. The parties shall submit confidential settlement statements no later than 1/22/2019, in accordance with this order. (cc: CKD, ADR) (Yin, K)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 08/15/18 GRANTING 48 Motion to modify the scheduling order. The dispositive motion deadline is extended through 10/09/18. (Plummer, M)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/30/18 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 42 Motion to Compel and DENYING 44 Motion for inspection and protective order. (Plummer, M)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/30/18 DENYING 36 plaintiffs motion to depose witnesses by written questions. (Plummer, M)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/27/2017 DENYING 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (York, M)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 08/08/17 ordering the 7/24/17 order is amended to replace the name "Harper" wherever it appears with "Harris." The summons form submitted by plaintiff for defendant "Harper and/or Harris" should be considered a summons form for defendant Harris. The clerk of the court is directed to return the copy of the first amended complaint submitted by plaintiff on 7/31/17. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit to the court the 4 additional copies of the complaint required to effect service. (Plummer, M)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Byron Dewayne Cuff signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/30/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward t o the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/13/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for the appointment of counsel 3 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuff v. Department of State Hospitals (DSH) - Stockton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State Hospitals (DSH) - Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Health Care Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Celaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osuj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Dewayne Cuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?