Spies et al v. El Dorado County et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence Spies, Sr., Linda Spies and Lawrence Spies, Jr.
Defendant: El Dorado County, California Forensic Medical Group Inc., Marshall Medical Center, John D'Agostini, Randy Peshon, Matt Foxworthy, Jackie Noren, Robin Hope, Raymond Herr, Lisa Issacson, Taylor Fithian, Mark Hangebrauck, John Skratt and Alexis F. Lieser
Case Number: 2:2016cv02232
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/20/2018 ORDERING that this action be DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/3/2018 ORDERING this action is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Marshall Medical Center. Each party is to bear its/their own fees and costs, including all attorneys' fees. (Zignago, K.)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/24/2018 DENYING 111 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Washington, S)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/22/18: The date for initial disclosure of experts is extended to August 9, 2018. All other dates found in the court's scheduling order remain unchanged. (Kaminski, H)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/18/18: Defendants Raymond Herr, Robin Hope, Lisa Issacson, California Forensic Medical Group Inc. and Taylor Fithian terminated. Each party is to bear its/their own fees and costs, including all attorneys' fees. (Kaminski, H)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/13/18 as to Defendants Matt Foxworthy, Mark Hangebrauck, Jackie Noren, Randy Peshon, John D'Agostini and El Dorado County only. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 06/22/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 112 Motion to Compel shall be heard by the court at its regular law andmotion calendar on 07/19/18 at 9:00 a.m.; parties shall submit a joint statement r egarding the discovery dispute by 07/12/18; the Scheduling Order is AMENDED to extend the non-expert discovery deadline to the date of the hearing for the sole purpose of ruling upon plaintiff's discovery motion, and may, or may not, be extended further for this sole purpose depending on the outcome of that hearing. Non-expert discovery is otherwise closed. (Benson, A.)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify the Scheduling Order 99 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/7/2018: The discovery cutoff is extended to 6/26/2018. The deadline for Expert Disclosures is extended 7/26/2018. The deadline for Rebuttals th ereto is extended to 8/21/2018. The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended to 8/21/2018. The deadline for depositions of expert witnesses is extended to 9/20/2018. The Pretrial Conference is reset for 11/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial date is reset for 1/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/21/2018 GRANTING 87 Motion to Substitute parties in light of plaintiff Lawrence Spies' death. Linda Spies, Brian Spies, Stephanie Spies, and Theresa Spies, are hereby SUBSTITUTED for plain tiff Lawrence Spies as plaintiffs in this action. This order is without prejudice to the right of any defendant to file a motion to dismiss or for summary judgment on any grounds, including the ground that the substituted parties are not proper parties to the action. (York, M)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/12/2018 APPROVING 75 Stipulation and Proposed Order with the following conditions: No non-discovery motions are to be brought in contravention of the presently scheduled motion cutoff date. No motions relating to discovery may be brought after the currently scheduled cutoff, save that motions related to expert depositions may be heard no later than 6/7/2018. (Washington, S) Modified on 2/12/2018 (Washington, S).
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/22/2018 GRANTING-IN-PART 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Hunt, G)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/17/2018 ORDERING the deadline for expert disclosure is EXTENDED from 1/22/2018 to 4/26/2018. The deadline for rebuttal disclosures is EXTENDED from 2/26/2018 to 5/21/2018. The deadline for depositions of expert witnesses is EXTENDED to 6/21/2017. The deadline for completion of non-expert discovery shall remain 3/26/2018 and shall the remaining dates found in the Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Zignago, K.)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION and ORDER 72 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/13/2017 dismissing with prejudice defendant Alexis F. Lieser. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER 49 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/13/2017 continuing 37 Defendant Marshall Medical Center's Motion for Summary Judgment to 12/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER 46 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/24/2017 continuing the hearing on 37 Defendant Marshall Medical Center's Motion for Summary Judgment to 10/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/17/17. (Kaminski, H)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/12/2016 DENYING 6 defendant Marshall Medical's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Kirksey Smith, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spies et al v. El Dorado County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Spies, Sr.
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Spies
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Spies, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Dorado County
Represented By: Amie Collins McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D'Agostini
Represented By: Amie Collins McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Peshon
Represented By: Amie Collins McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Foxworthy
Represented By: Amie Collins McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Noren
Represented By: Amie Collins McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Issacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fithian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hangebrauck
Represented By: Amie Collins McTavish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Skratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis F. Lieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?