Carroll v. Spearman

Plaintiff: Tremayne Deon Carroll
Defendant: Spearman
Case Number: 2:2016cv02443
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/26/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 21, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 16 "Petition to Subpoena Record and Contact/Name of Construction Company and CDCR Official Who Granted It [and Request for] Appointment of Counsel." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date this order is signed. (Yin, K)
August 29, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/29/2017 GRANTING 14 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff has 45 days from the date this order is served to file his motion for reconsideration. (Donati, J)
August 4, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/3/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tremayne Deon Carroll. The Director of the CDCR shall collect monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tremayne Deon Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?