Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jo Ellen Darcy, Todd T Semonite and David Ray
Case Number: 2:2017cv00120
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/19/2020 ORDERING that the 3/30/2020 motion hearing and the 5/12/2020 trial date are VACATED. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 5/12/2020 if settlement has not been approved and finalized. (Kastilahn, A) (Main Document 81 replaced on 3/19/2020) (Kastilahn, A).
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/8/20 CONTINUING Settlement Conference to 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8. (Hinkle, T)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/13/2019 ORDERING 74 that the follow-up meeting to the Settlement Conference be CONTINUTED to 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan.(Reader, L)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance 72 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/13/20: The Hearing Regarding Claim Under Administrative Procedure Act is reset for 3/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Bench Trial is reset for 5/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/15/19. Plaintiff's proposed modified exhibit list attached as Exhibit 1 [59-1] to Plaintiffs 8/13/19 request, shall replace Exhibit C of the Final Pretrial Order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/18/2019 GRANTING 44 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/16/2019 AMENDING 41 Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: All discovery, except for the deposition of Michael D. Harvey, shall be conducted so as to be completed by 5/15/2019. All motions to compel discovery, except for motions related to the deposition of Michael D. Harvey, must be noticed on the magistrate judge's calendar in accordance with the local rules of this court and so that such motions may be heard (and any resulting orders obeyed) not later than 5/15/2019. Any motions to compel related to the deposition of Michael D. Harvey must be noticed on the magistrate judge's calendar in accordance with the local rules of this court and so that such motions may be heard (and any resulting orders obeyed) not later than 6/21/2019. This amendment shall have no effect on any of the other deadlines established by the Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Huang, H)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/4/19 ORDERING that the stay issued on January 18, 2019 is lifted. Discovery due by 5/15/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/14/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Bench Trial set for 10/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/18/2019: There being no opposition to Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District's (GCID) Motion for Stay and Request to Vacate Order Modifying Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order, and good cause appearing, the Court hereby ORDERS that: 1) GCID's Motion for Stay 32 is GRANTED; 2) The action, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District v. United States Army Corps of Engineers, et al., Case No. 2:17-CV-00120-WBS- CKD, is STAYED; 3) The Order Modifying the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order 30 resetting dates and deadlines is VACATED; 4) Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time 36 is MOOT; and 5) The parties shall file a Joint Status Report informing the Court once they agree that the stay should be lifted. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/23/2018 ODERING the scheduling order MODIFIED as follows: Discovery to be completed by 2/8/2019; All motions to compel discover shall be heard by 2/8/2019; Dispositive Motions filed by 3/1/2019; Bench Trial CONTINUED to 7/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 5/13/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Washington, S)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/15/2018 ORDERING that plaintiff Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District may take 10 depositions beyond the presumptive limit of 10 depositions outlined in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for a total of 20 depositions. (Washington, S)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/10/17, ORDERING that the time for defendants to file their answer to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 7/18/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/27/2017 DENYING 13 Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/12/2017 ORDERING that the hearing re 13 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 6/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Zignago, K.)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/7/17: Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is continued to 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed by May 22, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District
Represented By: Michael Arthur Gheleta
Represented By: Francis M Goldsberry, II
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Alexis Keane Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ellen Darcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd T Semonite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?