Mills v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: |
Kenneth Wayne Mills |
Defendant: |
Robert W. Fox and A. Goodson |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00152 |
Filed: |
January 24, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Solano |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig M. Kellison |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 27, 2019 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/27/2019 ADOPTED in FULL 14 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Fox are DISMISSED without further leave to amend for failure to state a claim; Plaintiff's c laims related to the conditions of his confinement be dismissed without further leave to amend for failure to state a claim, and this action proceeds on the original complaint on plaintiff's access to the courts claim against defendant Goodson only. (Reader, L)
|
February 4, 2019 |
Filing
18
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/4/2019 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
December 7, 2018 |
Filing
14
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/06/18 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs claims against defendant Fox be dismissed without further leave to amend for failure to state a claim. Plaintiffs claims related to the c onditions of his confinement be dismissed without further leave to amend for failure to state a claim; and this action proceed on the original complaint on plaintiffs access to the courts claim against defendant Goodson only. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
October 25, 2018 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/24/2018 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Huang, H)
|
August 7, 2018 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/06/18 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kenneth Wayne Mills. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial). (Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?