Quezada v. Muniz
Defendant: W. L. Muniz
Petitioner: German Yovani Quezada
Case Number: 2:2017cv00243
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/4/2017 GRANTING 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner to file and serve traverse within 60 days after service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/13/2017 ORDERING Petitioner to pay the appropriate filing fee or file an application to proceed IFP within 30 days.(Henshaw, R)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/10/2017 ORDERING petitioner shall have 30 days to pay the appropriate filing fee; and petitioner's 4 motion to stay is DENIED as moot. (Yin, K)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/4/2017 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an application to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/10/17 ORDERING that Petitioner's motion for a sixty-day extension of time to file a petition for habeas corpus (ECF No. 1 ) is DENIED. Petitioner's motion to stay proceedings (ECF No. 1 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service of this order to file a petition for habeas corpus. If petitioner is seeking a stay, he may file a motion for stay once he has filed a petition for habeas corpus. Petit ioner shall submit, within 30 days from service of this order, an application in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee. Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district and the courts form for application for writ of habeas corpus.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quezada v. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: German Yovani Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. L. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?