(PC) Robertson v. Willows Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Robertson and Kenneth Wayne Roberson
Defendant: Willows Police Department, Michael Stover, County of Glenn,California, Donald Cole Byrd, Albert Smith, Ruby Neumann and City of Willows
Case Number: 2:2017cv00352
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Glenn
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order and #15 Judgment served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Benson, A)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT dated *04/14/17* pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/14/17. (Benson, A)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/14/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; however, no fee is imposed; this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a cognizable claim, and because this deficiency cannot be cured by amendment. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
March 2, 2017 Filing 13 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Wayne Robertson. (Michel, G.)
February 27, 2017 Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Kenneth Wayne Robertson. (Michel, G.)
February 27, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Notice re TRUST STATEMENT NEEDED, served on Kenneth Wayne Robertson. (Dillon, M)
February 27, 2017 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Kenneth Wayne Robertson, CDC AY-1348 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Dillon, M)
February 17, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kenneth Wayne Robertson. (Sant Agata, S)
February 17, 2017 Filing 10 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
February 17, 2017 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:16-cv-06903.
February 16, 2017 Case electronically transferred to the USDC Eastern District of California (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer the case forthwith. Motions terminated: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/15/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]
December 30, 2016 Filing 7 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneth Wayne Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth Wayne Robertson. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth Wayne Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/9/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth Wayne Robertson. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald Cole Byrd, City of Willows, County of Glenn,California, Ruby Neumann, Albert Smith, Michael Stover, Willows Police Department. Filed byKenneth Wayne Robertson. Consent/Declination due by 12/30/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016) [Transferred from cand on 2/17/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Robertson v. Willows Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willows Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Glenn,California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Cole Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Willows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?