Bradley v. Spearman
Petitioner: Anthony Phillip Bradley
Respondent: Spearman
Case Number: 2:2017cv00828
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/14/2018 DENYING as untimely 24 Motion for Extension of Time and RECOMMENDING 21 Motion for Stay be denied and 1 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/2017 GRANTING petitioner 30 days to file his traverse and, if he chooses, a motion for stay.(Yin, K)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/25/2017 ORDERING petitioner to submit an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Phillip Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Spearman
Represented By: Mary Alex Dabiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?