Campos-Rodriguez v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: |
Jose Arbor Campos-Rodriguez |
Defendant: |
Jones, Bedford and Green |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01269 |
Filed: |
June 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
El Dorado |
Presiding Judge: |
Deborah Barnes |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 27, 2018 |
Filing
40
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/26/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to comply with the local rules and with court orders. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objection due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
|
October 19, 2018 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/18/2018 DIRECTING that Plaintiff shall provide the court with his current address within 30 days of the date of this order. (Huang, H) Modified on 10/19/2018 (Huang, H).
|
June 6, 2018 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2018 ADOPTING 23 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 17 Motion for Injunction. (Hunt, G)
|
April 3, 2018 |
Filing
23
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/2/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to make 2 copies of 1 Complaint to permit the U.S. Marshal to effect service of the complaint; serve a copy of this order on Capta in Noren, Lieutenant Green, and Sergeant George, El Dorado County Sheriffs Office, South Lake Tahoe Jail, 1051 Al Tahoe Blvd., South Lake Tahoe, CA 96150; randomly assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING 17 Motion for Injunction regarding law library access be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
March 19, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/19/18 ORDERING that within 10 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a supplement to his motion for a preliminary injunction to address the court's concerns set out above. (Plummer, M)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Filing
14
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jose Arbor Campos-Rodriguez signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/23/18. The Sheriff of El Dorado County shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of El Dorado County. The clerk shall also forward a copy of this order on the Financial division of the court. (cc: Financial)(Plummer, M)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/23/17 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, either the $350.00 filing fee plus the $50.00 administrative fee or a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner for use in a civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?