Putney v. Fox et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Earl Putney
Defendant: Robert Fox, Joseph Bick and Shaw
Case Number: 2:2017cv01507
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/27/2018 ORDERING the Office of the CA Attorney General to contact the CHCF Litigation Coordinator to determine what, if any, access plaintiff currently has to his legal materials; whether plaintif f will be provided his legal materials while he is incarcerated at CHCF; and whether his incarceration there is intended to be temporary and file and serve a statement reflecting the findings of such inquiry, including all appropriate declarations, within 20 days after the filing date of this order. (cc: Ms. Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
January 25, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/25/2018 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 21 request for appointment of counsel and VACATING the 20 findings and recommendations filed 10/31/2017. Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
October 31, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/30/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
September 14, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Thomas Earl Putney signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/13/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
August 16, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/15/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 4 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putney v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Earl Putney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?