Dayton v. City of Fairfield et al

Plaintiff: Edward R. Dayton
Defendant: City of Fairfield, David James, Fairfield Police Department, Christina L. Browning and David Doyle
Case Number: 2:2017cv01898
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/15/18 ORDERING that Defendants' Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint (ECF No. 8 ) be GRANTED IN PART as to all defendants. All claim s against defendant Christina Browning be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's remaining federal claims brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's remaining state law claims be DISMISSED WITHOUT P REJUDICE. The Clerk of Court be ordered to close the case. IT IS ALSO HEREBY ORDERED that all pleading, discovery, and Motion practice in this action are STAYED pending resolution of the findings and recommendations. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 16, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/16/18 DENYING 11 Ex Parte Application for an order authorizing service by publication on David James: Plaintiff is granted a forty-five (45) day extension, from January 10, 2018, to serve defendant David James. (Kaminski, H)
October 18, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/18/2017 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 28 days of this order, plaintiffs shall pay the applicable filing fee. However, the court will entertain a request for a reasonable extension of time to pay the fee should such an extension be necessary. Failure to timely pay the filing fee, or timely request an extension of time to do so, may result in dismissal of the action. (Washington, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dayton v. City of Fairfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward R. Dayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina L. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?