National Association of Wheat Growers et al v. Zeise et al
Plaintiff: Associated Industries of Missouri, Agribusiness Association of Iowa, National Corn Growers Association, South Dakota Agri-Business Association, Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Western Plant Health Association, United States Durum Growers Association, National Association of Wheat Growers, North Dakota Grain Growers Association, Iowa Soybean Association, Monsanto Company, Missouri Farm Bureau, CropLife America and Agricultural Retailers Association
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Lauren Zeise
Amicus Curiae: State of Iowa, State of Indiana, The National Health Federation, Sierra Club, State of South Dakota, Center for Environmental Health, State of Louisiana, State of Kansas, State of Idaho, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., The California Chamber of Commerce, State of Michigan, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of Missouri, State of Wisconsin and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv02401
Filed: November 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 USCA CASE NUMBER 20-16758 for #161 Notice of Appeal filed by Xavier Becerra. (York, M)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #161 Notice of Appeal filed by Xavier Becerra. Notice of Appeal filed *9/9/2020*, Complaint filed *11/15/2017* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *8/11/2020*. Court Reporter: *Kimberly Bennett*. *Fee Status: Paid on 9/9/2020 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Tupolo, A)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of APPEAL by Xavier Becerra as to #158 Order and #159 Judgment. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-9104599) (Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 9/9/2020 (Donati, J).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Matthew T. Schelp, PHV terminated (Diehr, Matthew)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JUDGMENT dated *8/11/20* pursuant to order signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/10/20. (Kaminski, H)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/10/20 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' pending claims in their First Amended Complaint #23 , consisting of Claim II and Claim III are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot. The court GRANTS LEAVE to Plaintiffs to refile Claim II and Claim III in the event that, following appeal, the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals remands this matter to this court. The Clerk shall separately enter judgment pursuant to the court's Memorandum and Order Re: Cross Motions for Summary Judgment, #155 , issued on June 22, 2020. (Kaminski, H)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 JOINT RESPONSE to #156 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by all paries. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Philip) Modified on 8/10/2020 (Tupolo, A).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/30/2020 ORDERING that on or before 8/14/2020, the parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, if any there be, why the remaining counts of the First Amended Complaint should not be dismissed as moot and why final judgment should not now be entered. In the absence of a showing of good cause, the remaining counts will be dismissed and the court will forthwith enter final judgment on its order of 6/22/2020.(Becknal, R)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/22/2020 GRANTING Plaintiffs' #117 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING Defendant's #124 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for a permanent injunction enjoining the warning requirement of California Health and Safety Code 25249.6 as to glyphosate is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that #117 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and #124 Defendant Becerra's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment now set for hearing on 6/15/2020 are taken off calendar and under submission to be decided on the papers. No appearance is required. The Court shall issue a separate order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 DECLARATION of Laura J. Zuckerman in support of #150 Reply. (Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 4/17/2020 (Huang, H).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 EXHIBITS A through M to #153 Declaration of Laura J. Zuckerman by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 4/17/2020 (Huang, H).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 [DISREGARD - Counsel to Refile with Signature] DECLARATION of Laura J. Zuckerman in support of #150 Reply. (Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 4/16/2020 (Huang, H).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REPLY in support of #124 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Xavier Becerra. (Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 4/16/2020 (Huang, H).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/25/2020 ORDERING that by April 15,2020 Defendant shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment. (Kaminski, H)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Revise Briefing Schedule by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zuckerman, Laura)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/20/2020 REVISING HEARING SCHEDULE on #117 and #124 cross-motions for summary judgment to 6/15/2020, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 5 (WBS), before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (York, M)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION to Revise Hearing Schedule by Agricultural Retailers Association, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Philip) Modified on 2/21/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Flash Drive from Philip J. Perry re #145 Notice of Lodging. [Routed to file room] (Text only entry) (Coll, A)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS ELECTRONICALLY in SUPPORT of #144 Opposition to Defendant's #124 Cross-Motion and Reply to its' #117 Motion by Plaintiffs . (Perry, Philip) Modified on 2/13/2020 (York, M).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 OPPOSITION to Defendant's #124 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and REPLY in SUPPORT of #117 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of David Heering, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Response to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #18 Concordance in Reply to Defendants Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Perry, Philip) Modified on 2/13/2020 (York, M).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/3/20 ORDERING that Plaintiffs shall file their combined reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion by February 12, 2020. Defendant shall file his reply in support of his cross- motion for summary judgment by April 1, 2020. Hearing on Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is set for 4/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Revised Briefing and Hearing Schedule . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Philip)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 EXHIBIT AAA through OOO by Xavier Becerra re #130 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AAA, #2 Exhibit BBB, #3 Exhibit CCC, #4 Exhibit DDD, #5 Exhibit EEE, #6 Exhibit FFF, #7 Exhibit GGG, #8 Exhibit HHH, #9 Exhibit III, #10 Exhibit JJJ, #11 Exhibit KKK, #12 Exhibit LLL, #13 Exhibit MMM, #14 Exhibit NNN, #15 Exhibit OOO)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 EXHIBIT YY through ZZ by Xavier Becerra re #130 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit YY, #2 Exhibit ZZ)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 EXHIBIT XX by Xavier Becerra re #130 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit XX)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 EXHIBIT AA through WW by Xavier Becerra re #130 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit BB, #3 Exhibit CC, #4 Exhibit DD, #5 Exhibit EE, #6 Exhibit FF, #7 Exhibit GG, #8 Exhibit HH, #9 Exhibit II, #10 Exhibit JJ, #11 Exhibit KK, #12 Exhibit LL, #13 Exhibit MM, #14 Exhibit NN, #15 Exhibit OO, #16 Exhibit PP, #17 Exhibit QQ, #18 Exhibit RR, #19 Exhibit SS, #20 Exhibit TT, #21 Exhibit UU, #22 Exhibit VV, #23 Exhibit WW)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 EXHIBIT T through Z by Xavier Becerra re #130 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T, #2 Exhibit U, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit W, #5 Exhibit X, #6 Exhibit Y, #7 Exhibit Z)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 EXHIBIT S by Xavier Becerra re #130 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/20/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 EXHIBITS N through R by Xavier Becerra re #130 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit P, #4 Exhibit Q, #5 Exhibit R)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/20/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 EXHIBIT A by Xavier Becerra re #130 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit A Part 3, #4 Exhibit A Part 4, #5 Exhibit A Part 5, #6 Exhibit A Part 6)(Zuckerman, Laura)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 EXHIBITS B through M by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M)(Zuckerman, Laura)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/12/19 GRANTING #121 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Attorneys Joshua M. Divine, PHV and Travis Lillie terminated. (Benson, A.)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF LODGING by Xavier Becerra: Opposition and Exhibits. (Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/13/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DECLARATION of Laura Zuckerman in support of #125 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and #124 Opposition. (Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of Brian Lee, Ph.D. in support of #125 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and #124 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 DECLARATION of Patricia Randal in support of #125 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and #124 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 DECLARATION of Martha Sandy, Ph.D in support of #125 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and #124 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DECLARATION of Susan Fiering in support of #125 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and #124 Opposition. (Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDA and NOTICE to SCHEDULE HEARING on #124 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Xavier Becerra. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Response to SUF, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and OPPOSITION to #117 Motion for Summary Judgment by Xavier Becerra . Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 12/12/2019 (York, M). Modified on 12/13/2019 (Kirksey Smith, K).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 PROPOSED ORDER re #121 Motion to Withdraw by State of Missouri. (Lillie, Travis) Modified on 12/11/2019 (Benson, A.).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/2/2019 (TEXT ONLY): The parties are hereby notified that #121 Amici States' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney must be filed as a noticed motion pursuant to Local Rule 230(b). The motion shall be noticed for 1/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Counsel for the Amici States is therefore, instructed to immediately file and serve a notice of motion setting forth the above referenced date and time, or the motion will be stricken. The parties are further instructed to review the Local Rules and Judge Shubb's standard information on the court's website for available hearing dates prior to filing any motions. (Michel, G.)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by State of Missouri. Attorney Lillie, Travis added. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel)(Lillie, Travis) Modified on 12/2/2019 (Coll, A).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER REVISING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/15/2019: By 12/11/2019, Defendant shall file its combined opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment, if any. By 1/29/2020, Plaintiffs shall file their combined reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion, if any. By 3/4/2020, Defendant shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment, if any. A hearing on the motion(s) for summary judgment shall take place on 3/23/2020, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 5 (WBS), before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (York, M)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Revise Briefing and Hearing Schedule by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modified on 10/16/2019 (Huang, H).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT re #118 of #117 Motion for Summary Judgment (1 flash drive) from Latham & Watkins LLP (routed to file room). (Text only entry) (Huang, H)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT(S) ELECTRONICALLY by All Plaintiffs : Motion for Summary Judgment and Documents in Support Thereof. (Perry, Philip)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Appendix 1, #4 Declaration of David Heering, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L , #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W , #28 Exhibit X - Part 1, #29 Exhibit X - Part 2, #30 Exhibit Y, #31 Exhibit Z, #32 Exhibit AA, #33 Exhibit BB, #34 Exhibit CC, #35 Exhibit DD, #36 Exhibit EE, #37 Exhibit FF, #38 Exhibit GG, #39 Exhibit HH, #40 Exhibit II , #41 Exhibit JJ , #42 Exhibit KK, #43 Exhibit LL, #44 Exhibit MM, #45 Exhibit NN, #46 Exhibit OO, #47 Exhibit PP, #48 Exhibit QQ, #49 Exhibit RR, #50 Exhibit SS, #51 Exhibit TT, #52 Exhibit UU, #53 Exhibit VV, #54 Exhibit WW, #55 Exhibit XX, #56 Exhibit YY, #57 Exhibit ZZ , #58 Exhibit AAA, #59 Exhibit BBB, #60 Exhibit CCC, #61 Exhibit DDD, #62 Declaration of Trenton Norris, #63 Exhibit A, #64 Exhibit B, #65 Exhibit C, #66 Exhibit D, #67 Declaration of Jon Doggett, #68 Declaration of Blake Hurst, #69 Declaration of Blake Inman, #70 Declaration of Mark Jackson, #71 Declaration of Greg Kessel, #72 Declaration of Mark Martinson, #73 Declaration of Ray McCarty, #74 Declaration of Dan Mehan, #75 Declaration of Renee Pinel, #76 Declaration of Gordon Stoner, #77 Declaration of Dan Wogsland, #78 Declaration of Kathleen Zander, #79 Proposed Order)(Perry, Philip) Modified on 9/26/2019 (Benson, A.).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/26/19 ADDING Attorney Nicholas L. Schlossman, PHV for CropLife America and Monsanto Company. (Kastilahn, A)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #116 Pro Hac Vice Order served on Susan Sabina Fiering. (Kastilahn, A)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by CropLife America, Monsanto Company for attorney Nicholas L. Schlossman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8423605) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Perry, Philip)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER on SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/6/2019. Upon consideration of the parties' #113 Joint Notice, the Court hereby enters the following schedule: Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment (MSJ) by 9/25/2019. If any, Defendant shall file its combined opposition to Plaintiffs' MSJ and cross-MSJ by 11/6/2019. If any, Plaintiffs shall file their combined reply in support of their MSJ and opposition to Defendant's cross-MSJ by 12/13/2019. If any, Defendant shall file its reply in support of its cross-MSJ by 1/21/2020. Hearing on motion(s) for summary judgment SET for 2/10/2020, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 5 (WBS), before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The stay is hereby LIFTED. (York, M)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE and Proposed Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by CropLife America, Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Philip)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 4, 2018, Re: Motion to Stay Proceedings, before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Cathie Bodene, Phone number 916-446-6360 E-mail cbodene@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter Cathie Bodene or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 10/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2019. (Bodene, C)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #110 by Xavier Becerra for proceedings held on 09/04/2018 before Judge William B. Shuff. Court Reporter Cathie Bodene. (Leslie, Heather)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Becerra for proceedings held on September 4, 2018 before Judge William B. Shubb. Court Reporter Cathie Bodene. (Leslie, Heather)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/5/2018 GRANTING #104 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending issuance of opinions by the 9th Circuit in American Beverage Association v. City and County of San Francisco, No. 16-16072, and CTIA-The Wireless Association v. City of Berkeley, No. 16-15141. When the 9th Circuit has issued opinions in both those cases, counsel shall take the necessary steps to have this matter placed back on the calendar for further status conference. The briefing schedule and hearing date of 1/22/2019 on the cross-motions for summary judgment are VACATED. (York, M)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 9/4/2018 re #104 Defendant Xavier Becerra's Motion to Stay. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Richard Bress present. Defendants' Counsel Heather Leslie, Laura Zuckerman present. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Monsanto Company for proceedings held on 6/11/2018 before Judge William B. Shubb. Court Reporter Kacy Barajas. (Prins, Andrew)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPLY by Xavier Becerra re #105 Response, #104 Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Leslie, Heather) Modified on 8/29/2018 (Kaminski, H).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs to #104 Motion to Stay. (Perry, Philip) Modified on 8/17/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to STAY by Xavier Becerra. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Leslie, Heather) Modified on 8/1/2018 (Washington, S).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/16/18, ORDERING that the Court hereby enters the following schedule: Defendant shall file its Motion to Stay by 7/30/2018, Plaintiffs' response is due by 8/15/2018, Defendant shall file its Reply by 8/28/2018. The Court shall hold a hearing on Defendant's Motion to Stay on 9/4/2018. In the event Defendant's Motion to Stay is denied Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment by 9/14/2018, Defendant shall file its joint Opposition and Cross-Motion by 10/19/2018, Plaintiffs shall file their joint Reply in Support of Motion and Opposition to Defendants Cross-Motion by 11/26/2018, Defendant shall file its Reply in Support of Cross-Motion by 12/21/2018. The Court shall hold a hearing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment on 1/22/2019 at 1:30 p.m. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2018 is VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion held on June 11, 2018, before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Kacy Barajas, Phone number 916-426-7640 E-mail kbarajas.csr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018. (Barajas, K)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for a Scheduling Order by CropLife America, Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Philip) Modified on 7/17/2018 (Kaminski, H).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 JOINT STATUS REPORT by CropLife America, Monsanto Company. (Perry, Philip)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Monsanto Company. (Perry, Philip)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Becerra for proceedings held on 6/11/18 before Judge Honorable William B. Shubb. Court Reporter Kacy Barajas. (Zuckerman, Laura)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/12/2018 DENYING #81 Defendant's Motion to Alter or Amend Court's #75 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 6/11/2018 re #81 Defendant Becerra's Motion to Alter or Amend Court's Order Granting Preliminary Injunction. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. Court GRANTS defendants' request to continue the Scheduling Conference from 7/2/2018 to 7/30/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Plaintiffs have no objection. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 7/16/2018. The Court shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Richard Bress, Philip Perry, Andrew Prins present. Defendants' Counsel Laura Zuckerman, Susan Fiering present. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY by Xavier Becerra to Response re #81 Motion to Amend. (Fiering, Susan)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 (CORRECTED) MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that * #81 Defendant Becerra's Motion to Alter or Amend Court's Order Granting Preliminary Injunction is reset for hearing on 6/11/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Briefing on said motion shall remain as previously set (see Docket #86 ). (Kirksey Smith, K) *Modified on 5/7/2018 (Kirksey Smith, K).
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Dr. Lauren Zeise Without Prejudice and to Modify the Preliminary Injunction #91 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/4/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPPOSITION to #81 Motion to Amend. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Perry, Philip) Modified on 5/4/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Dr. Lauren Zeise Without Prejudice and to Modify the Preliminary Injunction by CropLife America, Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Philip)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Alexandra P. Shechtel by CropLife America, Monsanto Company. (Perry, Philip) Modified on 5/8/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of April 19, 2018 California Court of Appeal Opinion by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zuckerman, Laura)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Xavier Becerra in re #81 Motion to Amend the Judgment,. (Leslie, Heather)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ***DISREGARD; SEE DOCKET #88 ***REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Xavier Becerra in re #81 Motion to Amend the Judgment,. (Leslie, Heather) Modified on 4/13/2018 (Kirksey Smith, K).
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/10/2018 ORDERING Plaintiffs to file any opposition to the #81 and #83 Motions by 5/3/2018; Dr. Zeise shall file any reply to Opposition by 5/22/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Briefing Schedule by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Briefing Schedule)(Leslie, Heather)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference is continued from 5/21/2018 to 7/2/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 6/18/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the Pleadings and to Alter or Amend the Court's Order Granting Preliminary Injunction by Lauren Zeise. Motion Hearing SET for 5/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Leslie, Heather) Modified on 3/28/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Susan S. Fiering in support of #81 MOTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Fiering, Susan) Modified on 3/28/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to AMEND #75 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Xavier Becerra. Motion Hearing SET for 5/29/2018 at 01:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Fiering, Susan) Modified on 3/28/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/19/18. Added attorney Matthew P Diehr, PHV for All Plaintiffs Except Plaintiff Western Plant Health Association. (Kaminski, H)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Agribusiness Association of Iowa, Agricultural Retailers Association, Associated Industries of Missouri, CropLife America, Iowa Soybean Association, Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Missouri Farm Bureau, Monsanto Company, National Association of Wheat Growers, National Corn Growers Association, North Dakota Grain Growers Association, South Dakota Agri-Business Association, United States Durum Growers Association for attorney Matthew P. Diehr to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Miles, Christopher Claiborne added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7557665) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (MO))(Miles, Christopher)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 2/20/2018 before Judge William B. Shubb by Michael L. Baum. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Fabillaran, J)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION and ORDER for continuance #76 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/6/2018 resetting the Scheduling Conference for 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 5/7/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Status Conference by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. (Zuckerman, Laura)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/26/2018 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #29 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise for proceedings held on 2/20/18 before Judge Shubb. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Zuckerman, Laura)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. for proceedings held on 2/20/18 before Judge Shubb. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Kyle, Selena)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/20/18, before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett, Phone number 916-442-8420 E-mail reporter.bennett@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 3/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018. (Bennett, K)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Monsanto Company for proceedings held on 2/20/2018 before Judge William B. Shubb. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Prins, Andrew)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 2/20/2018 re #29 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Richard Bress present. Defendants' Counsel Laura Zuckerman present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE by Agribusiness Association of Iowa, et al., to #46 Objections. (Perry, Philip) Modified on 2/15/2018 (Benson, A.).
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE by Agribusiness Association of Iowa, et al., to #65 Order. (Norris, Trenton) Modified on 2/15/2018 (Benson, A.).
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE by Agribusiness Association of Iowa, et al., to #60 Brief/Exhibit. (Norris, Trenton) Modified on 2/15/2018 (Benson, A.).
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY by Agribusiness Association of Iowa, et al., in support of to #29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Supplemental Declaration of David C. Heering, #7 Declaration of Trenton H. Norris, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Supplemental Declaration of Blake Hurst, #13 Supplemental Declaration of Blake Inman, #14 Supplemental Declaration of Mark Jackson, #15 Supplemental Declaration of Timothy Martin, #16 Supplemental Declaration of Gordon Stoner)(Perry, Philip) Modified on 2/15/2018 (Benson, A.).
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/6/2018 GRANTING #56 National Health Federation and Moms Across America's MOTION for leave to file a brief as amici curiae in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PROPOSED ORDER re #56 Motion for Leave to File Brief (Tips, Scott) Modified on 2/6/2018 (Fabillaran, J).
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/1/2018 GRANTING #57 Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. (Fabillaran, J) Modified on 2/2/2018 (Kirksey Smith, K).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROPOSED ORDER re #57 Motion for Leave, #60 Amicus Brief,(Wall, Michael) Modified on 1/31/2018 (Kaminski, H).
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of January 29, 2018, Ninth Circuit Order by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zuckerman, Laura) Modi
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CORRECTED [PROPOSED] AMICUS BRIEF re #57 Motion for Leave filed by Center for Environmental Health, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Sierra Club. (Wall, Michael) Modified on 1/30/2018 (Kaminski, H).
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/26/18: Added attorney Elliot Belilos, PHV for Agricultural Retailers Association. (Kaminski, H)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/26/18: Added attorney Gary H. Baise, PHV for Agricultural Retailers Association. (Kaminski, H)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for LEAVE to File Amicus Brief in Support of #29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Sierra Club, Center for Environmental Health. Attorney Wall, Michael E. added. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Wall, Michael) Modified on 1/29/2018 (Kaminski, H).
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by The National Health Federation. Attorney Tips, Scott Cameron added. (Tips, Scott) Modified on 1/29/2018 (Kaminski, H).
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECLARATION of Susan S. Fiering re #54 Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fiering, Susan)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise to #35 Brief. (Fiering, Susan)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Agricultural Retailers Association for attorney Elliot Belilos to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7476419) (Miles, Christopher)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Agricultural Retailers Association for attorney Gary H. Baise to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7476378) (Miles, Christopher)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise to #40 Brief. (Zuckerman, Laura)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise to #29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zuckerman, Laura)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECLARATION of Laura J. Zuckerman re #50 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Zuckerman, Laura)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DECLARATION of Mario Fernandez re #50 Opposition. (Fiering, Susan)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROPOSED ORDER re Sustaining Defendant's Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re #46 Objections by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. (Fiering, Susan)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise to #29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Fiering, Susan)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ANSWER by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise.(Fiering, Susan)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of Susan S. Fiering re #42 Stipulation and Proposed Order,. (Fiering, Susan)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER for revised briefing schedule #42 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/5/2018: 1) 1/16/2018: By this date, Defendants shall answer Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; 2): 1/22/2018: By this date, Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction; 3) 1/26/2018: By this date, Defendants shall file their response to the two amicus curiae briefs filed on behalf of Plaintiffs. Any amicus curiae briefs in support of Defendants shall be filed by this date; 4) 2/12/2018: By this date, Plaintiffs shall file any reply in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction and any responses to amicus curiae briefs in support of Defendants; 5) 2/20/2018 at 1:30p.m.: On this date, the Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction; and 6) The dates set forth in this order shall supersede any earlier dates agreed to by the parties and ordered by the Court. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Revise Briefing Schedule by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. Attorney Leslie, Heather Colleen added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan S. Fiering, #2 Proposed Order)(Leslie, Heather) Modified on 1/8/2018 (Reader, L).
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/4/2018 ORDERING that No later than 1/26/2018, Defendants shall file any responses to the amicus curiae briefs filed by the US Chamber of Commerce and California Chamber of Commerce and by the State of Missouri and ten other States in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Any amicus curiae briefs in support of Defendants shall be filed no later than 1/26/2018. In the event that such amicus curiae briefs are filed, Plaintiffs shall respond to such amicus curiae briefs no more than ten days after the latest such brief is filed; A party's response to each filed amicus curiae brief shall be no more than 15 pages, except that each Party may combine its responses to multiple amicus curiae briefs in a single brief with a maximum page limit of 25 pages.(Becknal, R)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 BRIEF of Amici Curiae in support of #29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Divine, Joshua) Modified on 1/5/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Response to Amicus Briefs by Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fiering, Susan) Modified on 1/4/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/3/2018 GRANTING #34 State of Missouri, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Louisiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Dakota and State of Wisconsin's Motion to file Amicus Brief. The brief shall be filed within two days of entry of this Order. Defendants may respond to any arguments presented in the amicus brief in their opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction but are not required to do so. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Susan Sabina Fiering on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. Attorney Fiering, Susan Sabina added. (Fiering, Susan)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER re #34 MOTION by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Dakota, State of Wisconsin. (Divine, Joshua) Modified on 1/4/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 BRIEF of Amici Curiae by The California Chamber of Commerce, The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #29 . (Shah, Pratik) Modified on 1/4/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to FILE AMICUS BRIEF by State of Missouri, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Louisiana, State of Kansas, State of Michigan, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Dakota and State of Wisconsin. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief) (Divine, Joshua) Modified on 1/2/2018 (Donati, J). Modified on 1/3/2018 (Kirksey Smith, K).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/2/2018 GRANTING #32 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae: Amici curiae the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the California Chamber of Commerce shall file their brief within two days of entry of this Order. Defendants may respond to any arguments presented in the amicus brief in their opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction but are not required to do so. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of #29 Motion by The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The California Chamber of Commerce. Attorney Shah, Pratik Arvind added. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shah, Pratik) Modified on 12/28/2017 (Hunt, G).
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRO HAC VICE ORDER Added attorney Joshua M. Divine, PHV for plaintiffs signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/19/17. (Benson, A.)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Plaintiffs for attorney Joshua M. Divine to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Lillie, Travis added. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-7418085) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lillie, Travis)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O - Part 1, #19 Exhibit O - Part 2, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit AA, #32 Exhibit BB, #33 Exhibit CC, #34 Exhibit DD, #35 Exhibit EE, #36 Exhibit FF, #37 Exhibit GG, #38 Exhibit HH, #39 Exhibit II, #40 Declaration of David C. Heering, #41 Exhibit A, #42 Exhibit B, #43 Exhibit C, #44 Exhibit D, #45 Exhibit E, #46 Exhibit F, #47 Exhibit G, #48 Exhibit H, #49 Exhibit I, #50 Exhibit J, #51 Exhibit K, #52 Declaration of Blake Hurst, #53 Declaration of Blake Inman, #54 Declaration of Chris Novak, #55 Declaration of Dan Mehan, #56 Declaration of Dan Wogsland, #57 Declaration of Gordon Stoner, #58 Declaration of Greg Kessel, #59 Declaration of Joel Brinkmeyer, #60 Declaration of Kathleen Zander, #61 Declaration of Mark Jackson, #62 Declaration of Mark Martinson, #63 Declaration of Ray McCarty, #64 Declaration of Renee Pinel, #65 Proposed Order, #66 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Philip) Modified on 12/18/2017 (Zignago, K.).
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER #24 signed by District Judge John A. Mendez for Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/6/2017: 1) 12/8/2017: By this date, Plaintiffs shall file their motion for a preliminary injunction; 2) 1/16/2018: By this date, Defendants shall file any response to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction and shall answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; 3) 2/6/2018: By this date, Plaintiffs shall file any reply in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction, and any opposition to a response filed by Defendants other than an Answer; 4) 2/13/2018: By this date, Defendants shall file any reply in support of any response filed by Defendants other than an Answer; 5) 2/20/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: On this date, the Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction and any motion filed by Defendants on 2/16/2018, in response to the First Amended Complaint. (Kirksey Smith, K)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Agribusiness Association of Iowa, Agricultural Retailers Association, Associated Industries of Missouri, Iowa Soybean Association, Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Missouri Farm Bureau, National Association of Wheat Growers, National Corn Growers Association, North Dakota Grain Growers Association, South Dakota Agri-Business Association, United States Durum Growers Association. (Hanaway, Catherine)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Laura Zuckerman on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise. Attorney Zuckerman, Laura added. (Zuckerman, Laura)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff CropLife America. (Perry, Philip)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for a Scheduling Order to Brief Plaintffs' Forthcoming Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for Defendants to Respond to the Amended Complaint by CropLife America, Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Philip)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Monsanto Company, CropLife America. Attorney Perry, Philip J. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Amended))(Perry, Philip) Modified on 12/6/2017 (Kirksey Smith, K). Modified on 12/18/2017 (Zignago, K.).
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lauren Zeise served on 11/22/2017, answer due 12/13/2017. (Perry, Philip)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 11/16/2017, answer due 12/7/2017. (Perry, Philip)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alexandra P. Shechtel on behalf of Monsanto Company. Attorney Shechtel, Alexandra P. added. (Shechtel, Alexandra)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/29/17 (for William B. Shubb). Added attorney Andrew Prins, PHV for Monsanto Company. (Benson, A.)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/29/17 (for William B. Shubb). Added attorney Richard P. Bress, PHV for Monsanto Company. (Benson, A.)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez (for William B. Shubb) on 11/29/17. Added attorney Ryan S. Baasch, PHV for Monsanto Company. (Benson, A.)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ann Marguerite Grottveit on behalf of Western Plant Health Association. Attorney Grottveit, Ann Marguerite added. (Grottveit, Ann)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/16/2017 ADDING attorney Natalie R. Holden, PHV for Agribusiness Association of Iowa, Associated Industries of Missouri, Iowa Soybean Association, Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Missouri Farm Bureau, Monsanto Company, National Association of Wheat Growers, National Corn Growers Association, North Dakota Grain Growers Association, South Dakota Agri-Business Association, United States Durum Growers Association.(Washington, S)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Monsanto Company for attorney Ryan S. Baasch to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7369554) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Perry, Philip)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Monsanto Company for attorney Andrew D. Prins to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7369544) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Perry, Philip)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Monsanto Company for attorney Richard P. Bress to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7369477) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Perry, Philip)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Western Plant Health Association. (Grottveit, Ann)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Plaintiffs for attorney Natalie Rose Holden to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7368445) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miles, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/15/2017 ADDING attorney Matthew T. Schelp, PHV for Agribusiness Association of Iowa, Associated Industries of Missouri, Iowa Soybean Association, Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Missouri Farm Bureau, Monsanto Company, National Association of Wheat Growers, National Corn Growers Association, North Dakota Grain Growers Association, South Dakota Agri-Business Association, United States Durum Growers Association. (Washington, S)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/15/2017 ADDING attorney Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV for Agribusiness Association of Iowa, Associated Industries of Missouri, Iowa Soybean Association, Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Missouri Farm Bureau, Monsanto Company, National Association of Wheat Growers, National Corn Growers Association, North Dakota Grain Growers Association, South Dakota Agri-Business Association, United States Durum Growers Association. (Washington, S)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Plaintiffs for attorney Matthew J. Schelp to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7366835) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miles, Christopher) Modified on 11/16/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L)(Refunded two duplicate $225.00 Pro Hac filing fees; receipt numbers 0972-7366664 and 0972-7366607). Modified on 1/9/2018 (Butolph, J).
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Plaintiffs for attorney Catherine L. Hanaway to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7366779) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miles, Christopher) Modified on 11/16/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Lauren Zeise* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Philip J. Perry* *Latham & Watkins, LLP* *555 11th Street NW, Suite 1000* *Washington, DC 20004*. (Reader, L)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher Claiborne Miles on behalf of Agribusiness Association of Iowa, Associated Industries of Missouri, Iowa Soybean Association, Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Missouri Farm Bureau, Monsanto Company, National Association of Wheat Growers, National Corn Growers Association, North Dakota Grain Growers Association, South Dakota Agri-Business Association, United States Durum Growers Association. Attorney Miles, Christopher Claiborne added. (Miles, Christopher)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Monsanto Company. (Perry, Philip)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants by Monsanto Company. Attorney Perry, Philip J. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7365043) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association of Wheat Growers et al v. Zeise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Industries of Missouri
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agribusiness Association of Iowa
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Corn Growers Association
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota Agri-Business Association
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Plant Health Association
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Ann Marguerite Grottveit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Durum Growers Association
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association of Wheat Growers
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota Grain Growers Association
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa Soybean Association
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Philip J. Perry
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Ryan S. Baasch, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Alexandra P. Shechtel
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Nicholas L. Schlossman, PHV
Represented By: Richard P. Bress, PHV
Represented By: Trenton H. Norris
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Represented By: Andrew Prins, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Farm Bureau
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CropLife America
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Nicholas L. Schlossman, PHV
Represented By: Philip J. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agricultural Retailers Association
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Represented By: Natalie R. Holden, PHV
Represented By: Gary H. Baise, PHV
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway, PHV
Represented By: Matthew P. Diehr, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Represented By: Matthew T. Schelp, PHV
Represented By: Elliot Belilos, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Laura Zuckerman
Represented By: Heather Colleen Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Zeise
Represented By: Laura Zuckerman
Represented By: Heather Colleen Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Iowa
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Indiana
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Health Federation
Represented By: Scott Cameron Tips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sierra Club
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kansas
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Idaho
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The California Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Pratik Arvind Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Michigan
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Missouri
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Represented By: Travis Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Joshua M. Divine, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Pratik Arvind Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?