K. et al v. County of Sacramento et al

Plaintiff: A. K., A. S. and Aleshna Lata Kumari
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Jesse Cortez, Janelle Gonzalez, Leona Williams, Evelyn Martin and Anthony Martin
Case Number: 2:2018cv00061
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/8/2019 ORDERING that Defendant should answer or otherwise respond to 21 Third Amended Complaint on or before 2/7/2019. (Huang, H)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/14/2018 re 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, and Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement: IT IS ORDERED that 16 Defendants' Motion T o Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Pursuant to the discussion at oral argument, the 6 Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. Plaintiffs are given thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint consistent with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement be, and the same hereby is, DENIED AS MOOT. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/13/2018 GRANTING 11 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (Washington, S)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/28/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/18/2018 extending time for Defendants to respond to the second amended complaint twenty days following the Court's entry of an Order appointing a guardian ad litem for the minor children. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 05/07/2018 ORDERING that parties shall serve initial disclosures by 06/15/2018; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/07/2019 with any rebuttal disclosures due by 02/28/20 19; all discovery shall be completed by 5/28/2019; Non-Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 03/29/2019; Dispositive Motions filed by 06/24/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/03/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb with separate pretrial statements due pursuant to Local Rules 281 and 282; Jury Trial set for 10/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Fabillaran, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K. et al v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: Nilesh Choudhary
Represented By: Nilesh Choudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.
Represented By: Nilesh Choudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleshna Lata Kumari
Represented By: Nilesh Choudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Amanda Lynn McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leona Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?