Gonzalez v. YRC Worldwide Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Gonzalez
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc., USF Reddaway Inc. and Mark Girola
Case Number: 2:2018cv01280
Filed: May 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/17/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED Non-Expert Discovery due by 8/23/2019. Expert Disclosures due by 9/3/2019. Last day to hear dispositive Motions is 9/6/2019. Supplemental expert disclosures by 9/24/2019 and Expert Discovery by 10/25/2019. (Reader, L)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/2019 DISCHARGING 19 Order to Show Cause. (Zignago, K.)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/7/18 ORDERING that plaintiff's counsel is ordered to SHOW CAUSE within seven (7) days, why counsel should not be sanctioned in the amount of $250.00 for failing to appear. (Kastilahn, A)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/29/18. The Court orders that Lead Counsel for Defendants, Jason Mills, may monitor the 11/1/18 Status Conference by telephone, and Associate, Justin Hanassab, appear in person at the Status Conference. The court will expect Mr. Hanassab to speak on behalf of defendants. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. YRC Worldwide Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Gonzalez
Represented By: Stephen F. Danz
Represented By: Douglas E Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Jason S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF Reddaway Inc.
Represented By: Jason S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Girola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?