(HC) Scott v. Fox
Petitioner: Michael Ladonte Scott
Respondent: Robert W. Fox
Case Number: 2:2018cv02687
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Salinas Valley State Prison, P. O. Box 1050, Soledad, CA 93960 by Michael LaDonte Scott. (York, M)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Salinas Valley State Prison, P.O. Box 1050, Soledad, CA 93960 by Michael LaDonte Scott. (Kastilahn, A)
November 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 and #7 Orders, served on Michael LaDonte Scott. (Huang, H)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/6/2018 PARTIALLY GRANTING #11 Motion for Preliminary Relief. (Huang, H)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for PRELIMINARY RELIEF by Michael LaDonte Scott. (Becknal, R)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT Consent or Decline due by 11/19/2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/16/18. (Plummer, M)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 served on Tami Krenzin, Attorney General. (Plummer, M)
October 16, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Michael LaDonte Scott. (Plummer, M)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/16/18 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DENYING #3 motion to appoint counsel. Also, DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General.(cc: Tami Krenzin, Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Michael LaDonte Scott. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR STATUS by Michael LaDonte Scott. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 3, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael Ladonte Scott. (Jessen, A)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/2018. New Case Number 2:18-cv-02687-KJN (HC). Old Case Number 1:18-cv-01346-SAB (HC). (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Michael Ladonte Scott. (Marrujo, C)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael Ladonte Scott. (Marrujo, C)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Robert W. Fox by Michael Ladonte Scott. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Scott v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Ladonte Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?