Fisher et al v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Catherine Fisher and Donald Fisher
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00114
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/15/2019: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Motion for Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 3/21/2019 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 14, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT re #20 Declaration, #19 Reply Affidavit re Service by Catherine Fisher. (Demas, John)
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Nicholas J. Loncarich in support of #13 Motion to Remand and Amend. (Demas, John)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY by Catherine Fisher re #13 Motion to Remand and Amend. (Demas, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Zachary Leibold in opposition to #13 Motion to Remand and Amend. (Sordello, Richard)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION by Target Corporation to #13 Motion to Remand and Amend. (Sordello, Richard)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED First Amended Complaint by Catherine Fisher. (Schultz, Bradley) Modified on 2/19/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER #13 Motion to Remand and Amend. (Schultz, Bradley) Modified on 2/19/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Nicholas J. Loncarich in support of #13 Motion to Remand and Amend. (Schultz, Bradley) Modified on 2/19/2019 (Kastilahn, A).
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to REMAND and Motion for Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint by Catherine Fisher. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Schultz, Bradley)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/25/2019: The Court has received Plaintiff's Request to Substitute Defendant's True Name for Fictitious Name (ECF No. #11 ). Plaintiff is directed to file a properly noticed motion to amend the complaint under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 15 and Local Rule 230. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST to Substitute Defendant's True Name for Fictitious Name by Catherine Fisher. (Schultz, Bradley)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Catherine Fisher. (Schultz, Bradley)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Initial Pre-Trial Scheduling Order by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sordello, Richard)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal of Action by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Sordello, Richard)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Target Corporation. (Sordello, Richard)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Richard J. Sordello, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sordello, Richard)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Target Corporation. (Sordello, Richard)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Target Corporation. (Sordello, Richard)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Target Corporation. (Sordello, Richard)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento, case number 34-2018-00243770 by Target Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8064810) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sordello, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher et al v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Richard James Sordello, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Mordaunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Fisher
Represented By: Bradley A. Schultz
Represented By: John Demas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Fisher
Represented By: Eliot M. Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?