(PC) Harris v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Darren Harris
Defendant: Jerry Brown, Robert W. Fox and Scott Kernan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00311
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to California Medical Facility, P.O. Box 2000, Vacaville, CA 95696-2000 by Darren Harris. (Kastilahn, A)
April 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Darren Harris. (Kastilahn, A)
April 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order served on Darren Harris. (Henshaw, R)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/17/2019 VACATING #12 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file an amended complaint per #6 Order and NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Darren Harris. (Kastilahn, A)
April 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Findings and Recommendations served on Darren Harris. (Yin, K)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 [VACATED PER #14 ORDER] FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/10/2019 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K) Modified on 4/17/2019 (Henshaw, R).
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Darren Harris. (Kastilahn, A)
March 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Darren Harris. (Huang, H)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-00311-KJM-CKD (PC). (Huang, H)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Darren Harris. (Huang, H)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
February 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on Darren Harris. (Plummer, M)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Darren Harris signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/27/19. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
February 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Darren Harris. (Plummer, M)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/27/19 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be paid in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Darren Harris. (York, M)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Darren Harris, CDC J-12467 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
February 20, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Darren Harris. (Washington, S)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *2/20/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 3/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Washington, S)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Darren Harris. (Washington, S) Modified on 2/21/2019 (Plummer, M).
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Darren Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Washington, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Harris v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?