Garcia v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Sergio Garcia
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01249
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
2 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Corporation by Sergio Garcia.(Hawkins, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/19/2019 APPROVING the parties' Stipulation for Plaintiff to file a First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint within five (5) days of this Minute Order. Defendant's response is due twenty-one (21) days thereafter. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Sergio Garcia. (Hawkins, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Target Corporation re #6 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (York, M)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/9/2019. Case REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any previous orders issued by the undersigned judge in this case are hereby VACATED and SET ASIDE, and any dates previously set by the undersigned judge in this case are hereby VACATED. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-01249-TLN-DB. (York, M)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Target Corporation re #3 Civil New Case Documents for WBS. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Wohl, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00254638 by Target Corporation . (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8344039) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Michael Brewer, #3 Declaration of Anna M. Skaggs and Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration of Paul F. White, Ph.D., #5 Disclosure Statement)(Wohl, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Anna Marie Skaggs
Represented By: Ryan David Derry
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Garcia
Represented By: James Ross Hawkins
Represented By: Isandra Y. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?