Moore v. City of Fairfield et al
Plaintiff: Michael Moore
Defendant: City of Fairfield, Scott Ledford, Fairfield Police Department, Solano County Sheriff's Department and County of Solano
Case Number: 2:2019cv01314
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the October 31, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #10 ) is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Michel, G.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by City of Fairfield, Fairfield Police Department, Scott Ledford. Attorney Tran, Joanne added. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tran, Joanne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-03170.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #5 Stipulation for Transfer to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #4 Stipulation Setting Effective Date of Acceptance of Service and Responsive Pleading Deadline. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE TO EASTERN DISTRICT filed by City of Fairfield, Fairfield Police Department, Scott Ledford. (Fox, Gregory) (Filed on 7/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING EFFECTIVE DATE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE filed by City of Fairfield, Fairfield Police Department, Scott Ledford. (Fox, Gregory) (Filed on 7/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages: (1) 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 (Violation of Fourth Amendment Rights-Unreasonable Force); (2) 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 (Violation of Fourth Amendment Right-Unlawful Seizure); (3) 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 (Violation of Fourth Amendment Right-Unlawful Arrest); (4) Monell Claim; (5) Negligence; (6) Intentional Infliction of Emotion Distress; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13415464). Filed by Michael Moore. (Choyce, Dionne) (Filed on 6/6/2019) Modified on 6/11/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. City of Fairfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairfield
Represented By: Gregory M. Fox
Represented By: Joanne Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ledford
Represented By: Gregory M. Fox
Represented By: Joanne Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Police Department
Represented By: Gregory M. Fox
Represented By: Joanne Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moore
Represented By: Dionne Choyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?