(PC) Ribot v. Smith, et al.
Plaintiff: Hugo Ribot
Defendant: W. Vaughn, Kabir Matharn, Gregory C Tesluk, Robert Rudas, Jalal Soltanian, Stephen Tseng, James Chau, Christopher Smith and Dr. Kirsch
Case Number: 2:2019cv01361
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
August 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Hugo Ribot. (Henshaw, R)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/13/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Hugo Ribot. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Hugo Ribot. (Huang, H)
July 19, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Hugo Ribot. (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-04044.
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Sent copy of complaint Dkt.No. 1 to plaintiff. (aea, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hugo Ribot. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Hugo Ribot. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.] .
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Chau, Firsch, Kabir Matharn, Robert Rudas, Christopher Smith, Jalal Soltanian Zadeh, Gregory C Tesluk, Stephen Tseng, W. Vaughn Filed by Hugo Ribot. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #3 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Ribot v. Smith, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Ribot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabir Matharn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory C Tesluk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rudas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jalal Soltanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?